ITServe Alliance, Inc. v. DHS
Original Case: 1:20-cv-03855
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cvus-05074 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 22, 2024 12:44 PM EDT |
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Immigration Reform Law Institute
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ITServe Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/22/2024 12:44 PM EDT |
Friday, March 25, 2022 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 22-5074 | ||
NOTICE OF APPEAL [1940570] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-03855-TNM filed by ITServe Alliance, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5074 22-5074 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1940576] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/09/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/25/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/25/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/25/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/09/2022 22-5074 | ||
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1940585] filed by Joshua S. Press on behalf of Appellee DHS. 22-5074 (Press, Joshua) |