City of Santa Barbara v. 3M Company, The
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00993 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 24, 2022 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Santa Barbara
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/01 11:18 AM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:22-cv-00993-RMG granting 4417 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-00993-RMG) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Scott Summy, Carla Burke Pickrel, Cary McDougal, Cristina Sanchez, and John Fiske for City of Santa Barbara. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/1/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00993-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 01/31 11:34 AM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:22-cv-00993-RMG granting 4422 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (6) in case 2:22-cv-00993-RMG) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Philip F. Cossich, Jr., Darren Sumich, David Parsiola, Brandon Taylor, Christina Cossich, Andrew Cvitanovic, and Luana Smith for City of Santa Barbara. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/31/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00993-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 01/30 9:39 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Philip F. Cossich, Jr., Darren Sumich, David Parsiola, Brandon Taylor, Christina Cossich, Andrew Cvitanovic, and Luana Smith by City of Santa Barbara. Response to Motion due by 2/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00993-RMG(Taylor, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/30 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A Sansone on behalf of City of Santa Barbara Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00993-RMG(Sansone, Kenneth) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 01/30 2:52 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Scott Summy, Carla Burke Pickrel, Cary McDougal, and Jason Julius by City of Santa Barbara. Response to Motion due by 2/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00993-RMG(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), City of Santa Barbara v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-993-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Central California (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/28 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/28 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10413337.), filed by City of Santa Barbara. Service due by 6/27/2022(sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 03/28 3:05 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), City of Santa Barbara v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-993-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Central California (sshe, ) |