Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01079
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2022
Terminated:Oct 11, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc.
Represented By
Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
Represented By
Christopher D. Johnson
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/11 8:20 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01079 EEB Closed. (jc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Mon 09/26 9:29 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 09/26 3:42 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01079 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (jc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
12 12 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 06/13 7:09 AM
Order Approving Third Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc. Answer Due 10/10/2022 Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thursday, June 09, 2022
11 11 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 06/09 5:02 PM
Third Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Patrick R. Akers on behalf of Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc. Related [+]. (Akers, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
10 10 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 05/31 8:08 AM
Order Approving Second Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc. Answer Due 6/10/2022 Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Friday, May 27, 2022
9 9 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 05/27 11:56 AM
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Patrick R. Akers on behalf of Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc. Related [+]. (Akers, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/27 11:50 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Patrick R. Akers on behalf of Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc.... (Akers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/04 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, May 02, 2022
6 6 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 05/02 7:18 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc. Answer Due 5/27/2022 Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
5 5 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Wed 04/27 2:35 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, April 07, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 04/07 2:20 PM
Summons Service Executed On: NORTHSTAR DRILLSTEM TESTERS, INC. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 03/29 11:12 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01079 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31195153. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/28 9:11 PM
Summons Issued on Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc. Answer Due 04/27/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/28 9:10 PM
Adversary case 22-01079 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Northstar Drillstem Testers, Inc.. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/26/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]