Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01106
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Howard F. Sklar
Represented By
Howard F. Sklar
contact info
Defendant
Miraim Sklar L.C.
Represented By
Miraim Sklar L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Succession of Miriam Mandel Sklar
Represented By
Succession of Miriam Mandel Sklar
contact info
Defendant
Howard Trust
Represented By
Howard Trust
contact info
Defendant
Alan Grantor Trust
Represented By
Alan Grantor Trust
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Grantor Trust
Represented By
Jacob Grantor Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
M Thomas Kim, Creditor Trustee of the Sklarco Creditor Trust
Represented By
Stephen T Loden
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Sunday, August 11, 2024
87 87 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/11 10:19 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 86 7016 Scheduling Order
Thursday, August 08, 2024
86 86 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Fri 08/09 12:39 PM
7016 Scheduling Order RE: Related [+]. Discovery due by 5/30/2025 for68 , Dispositive Motion due 10/15/2025 for68 , (rxc)
Related: [-] 68 Amended Complaint