Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01110
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2022
Terminated:Jul 27, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
B & L Pipeco Services, Inc.
Represented By
B & L Pipeco Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim
Represented By
Christopher D. Johnson
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/27 2:43 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01110 EEB Closed. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 07/12 10:54 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01110 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 7/26/2022 to review for closing. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Mon 07/11 10:22 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, July 07, 2022
11 11 order Show Cause Thu 07/07 7:50 AM
Order to Show Cause Related [+]. Show Cause Response due date 7/28/2022. (mjb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, May 28, 2022
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/28 10:12 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/28/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thursday, May 26, 2022
9 9 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 05/26 7:47 AM
Order Approving Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint. B & L Pipeco Services, Inc.'s Answer Due 6/30/2022 Related [+]. (mjb)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, May 23, 2022
8 8 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 05/23 5:20 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, April 28, 2022
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/28 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/28/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
6 6 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/26 1:53 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant B & L Pipeco Services, Inc. Answer Due 5/30/2022 Related [+]. (mjb)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, April 25, 2022
5 5 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 04/25 1:13 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, April 14, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 04/14 3:38 PM
Summons Service Executed On: B & L Pipeco Services, Inc. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/01 2:23 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01110 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31205063. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 03/31 4:16 PM
Summons Issued on B & L Pipeco Services, Inc. Answer Due 05/2/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/31 4:16 PM
Adversary case 22-01110 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against B & L Pipeco Services, Inc.. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/29/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]