New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James L Garrity Jr
Case #: 1:22-bk-10436
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2022

Debtor
Reggiani Lighting USA Inc.
66 White St Unit 501 Fl 5
New York, NY 10013-3508
Represented By
Joseph Pack
Pack Law, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 04/07/2022 12:02 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 04/06 6:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 22-10436 ) [misc,969] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15728758. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/06 6:18 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Order for Relief Entered. Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 05/23/2022. Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122A-1 Due: 04/20/2022. Chapter 7 Means Test Form 122A-1Supp Exemption Due: 04/20/2022. Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2 Due: 04/20/2022. Schedule A/B due 04/20/2022. Schedule C due 04/20/2022. Schedule D due 04/20/2022. Schedule E/F due 04/20/2022. Schedule G due 04/20/2022. Schedule H due 04/20/2022. Schedule I due 04/20/2022. Schedule J due 04/20/2022. Schedule J-2 due 04/20/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/20/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/20/2022. Statement of Intention due 04/20/2022. Declaration of Schedules due 04/20/2022. Pro Se Debtor Signature On Petition due 04/20/2022. Authorized Representative of Debtor Signature on Petition Form 201 due 04/20/2022. Debtor 342B Signature On Petition due 04/20/2022. Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration and Signature Form 119 due 04/20/2022. List of All Creditors Required on Case Docket in PDF Format due 04/20/2022. Record of Interest in Education Individual Retirement Account Due: 04/20/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 04/20/2022, Filed by Joseph Pack of Pack Law, P.A. on behalf of Reggiani Lighting USA Inc.. (Pack, Joseph)
Related: [-]