Cyphers v. Camino Real Community Services et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jason K Pulliam |
Referred: | Elizabeth S Chestney |
Case #: | 5:22-cv-00357 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 10, 2022 5:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
Camino Real Community Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Emma Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Veronica Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regina Y. Cyphers
11680 S. Foster Road
San Antonio, TX 78223 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/23 2:59 PM
ORDERED, that the Court RESERVES RULING CyphersMotion to Vacate the Arbitration Award. See ECF No. 36.The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to remove the gavel in ECF No. 36. re36 MOTION to Vacate35 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Case, filed by Regina Y. Cyphers. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
Letter of Transmittal from USCA
Thu 07/18 4:03 PM
COPY of Letter of transmittal from USCA to Ms. Regina Y. Cyphers received for38 Notice of Appeal, filed by Regina Y. Cyphers.***We have docketed the appeal as shown above, and ask you to use the case number above in future inquiries.*** (dtg) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 07/11 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Regina Y. Cyphers. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out a[LINK:(Transcript Order)] and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (wg) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 06/24 4:20 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez, re36 MOTION to Vacate35 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Case, filed by Plaintiff Regina Y. Cyphers (Nail, Justin) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Vacate
Mon 06/10 4:11 PM
PRO-SE MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award35 Order, Judgment, Terminate Case, by Regina Y. Cyphers.(wg) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Addendum | ||
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 06/10 8:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING FINAL ARBITRAION AWARD re33 MOTION filed by Veronica Sanchez, Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT confirmation of the Final Award and entry of judgment thereon disposes of all Plaintiffs claims against Defendants before this Court, is final, and appealable. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg) |
|
utility
Notice of Correction
Fri 06/07 10:58 AM
Notice of Correction: Document Edited Text & Changed Event to Motion. re33 MOTION. (wg) |
||
utility
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/10 8:06 AM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) |
||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Attachment
Thu 06/06 4:44 PM
ATTACHMENT Documents filed with Defendants' Motion to Confirm to33 Attachment, by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez.(Nail, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment 1 - At Will Employment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Attachment 2 - Arb Selection, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Attachment 3 - Final Award | ||
33 | 33
misc
Attachment
Thu 06/06 4:33 PM
ATTACHMENT Defendants' Motion to Confirm Final Arbitration Award and For Entry of Judgment to32 Proposed Order by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez.(Nail, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - At Will Employment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Demand for Arbitration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Final Award, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Arbitration Ruoles, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order Order | ||
32 | 32
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 06/06 4:25 PM
Proposed Order Judgment Confirming Award to18 Order,, Terminate Motions, by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez. (Nail, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Wed 04/24 11:36 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez. (Nail, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Wed 01/24 4:31 PM
STATUS REPORT by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez. (Nail, Justin) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/23 3:44 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez. (Nail, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 10/17 5:23 PM
ORDER --IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties submit to the Court a joint status report on or before October 24, 2023, informing the Court of the status of the arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to file quarterly status reports thereafter until the resolution of the arbitration, ( Status Report due by 10/24/2023,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/17 1:38 PM
ORDER DENYING24 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Stay to ArbitratePursuant to the FAA. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 07/12 4:44 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Camino Real Community Services, re24 MOTION Stay case pending Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Regina Y. Cyphers (Nail, Justin) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/12 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin J. Nail on behalf of Camino Real Community Services. Attorney Justin J. Nail added to party Camino Real Community Services(pty:dft) (Nail, Justin) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 07/06 4:09 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to Stay Case pending Arbitration by Regina Y. Cyphers.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Advisory to the Court
Mon 05/22 4:58 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez Defendants . |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/03 11:20 AM
STATUS REPORT by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez. |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/28 7:41 AM
ORDERED, that the parties submit to the Court a joint status report onor before April 4, 2023, informing the Court of the status of the arbitration.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to file quarterly status reports thereafter until the resolution of the arbitration. re18 Order,, Terminate Motions,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Response
Tue 11/22 1:57 PM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to19 Advisory to the Court by Regina Y. Cyphers. (wg) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Advisory to the Court
Mon 11/21 5:24 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez Quarterly Advisory . |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 08/24 1:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING re8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Supporting Brief filed by Veronica Sanchez, Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Plaintiff's claims are hereby STAYED pending the completion of Arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants file a quarterly advisory regarding the status of the arbitration, with the first advisory due on November 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Pretrial Conference Motion Hearing
Tue 08/23 2:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney Via Zoom: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/23/2022 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2022 re8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Supporting Brief filed by Veronica Sanchez, Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR-Gold.)(wg) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 08/22 3:49 PM
PRO-SE RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Regina Y. Cyphers, re8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Supporting Brief filed by Defendant Veronica Sanchez, Defendant Camino Real Community Services, Defendant Emma Garcia (wg) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 08/22 3:01 PM
PRO-SE NOTICE of Filing JOINT FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 REPORT by Regina Y. Cyphers (wg) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/22 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R. Gaines Griffin on behalf of Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez. Attorney R. Gaines Griffin added to party Camino Real Community Services(pty:dft), Attorney R. Gaines Griffin added to party Emma Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney R. Gaines Griffin added to party Veronica Sanchez(pty:dft) (Griffin, R.) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan
Fri 08/19 3:26 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez. |
|
12 | 12
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 08/19 3:19 PM
Scheduling Recommendations Joint by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez. |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Fri 06/24 1:51 PM
Acknowledgment of Service returned by Regina Y. Cyphers. Camino Real Community Services served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/30/2022; Emma Garcia served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/30/2022; Veronica Sanchez served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (wg) |
|
10 | 10
8
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/23 12:56 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/19/2022,, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2022 01:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) |
|
Monday, June 20, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/20 6:22 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez |
|
8 | 8
motion
Compel
Mon 06/20 1:30 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Supporting Brief by Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings | ||
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/02 3:14 PM
USM/285'S & Summons Issued as to Camino Real Community Services, Emma Garcia, Veronica Sanchez, with a Copy of Service Order & Complaint. Forwarded to the USMS for service upon Defts. (wg) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Mon 05/02 1:19 PM
Remark: Recd. 3 USM/285's completed for service of process. (wg) |
||
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
4
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/25 12:51 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/22 5:50 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Regina Y. Cyphers.(mgr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/22 5:48 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/22 5:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if not already accomplished, within ten (10) days ofthe date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit to the Clerks Office a fully completed United States Marshal Service Form 285, including fully complete addresses, for each Defendant required to be served and the United States Marshals Service shall serve each Defendant with a copy of theComplaint and a copy of this order by certified mail, return receipt requested Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Opening Letter
Mon 04/18 8:54 AM
Case Opening Letter to Regina Y. Cyphers. (dtg) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/14 5:43 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Regina Y. Cyphers.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |