Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Robin J Cauthron
Case #: 5:22-cv-00318
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2022
Terminated:Dec 19, 2022
Case in other court:The District Court of McClain County, CJ-21-00185
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 12, 2022 3:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Kerry R Lewis
Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable
contact info
Austin T Jackson
Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable
contact info
Plaintiff
Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC
Represented By
Daniel C Hays
Chansolme Harroz Hays, PLLC
contact info
Elise M Horne
Goolsby Proctor Heefner & Gibbs PC
contact info
Perry E Kaufman
Goolsby Proctor Heefner & Gibbs PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 19, 2022
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/19 1:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company. (Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Tue 11/29 3:19 PM
ORDER as to27 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 11/29/22. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
27 27 motion Vacate Mon 11/21 8:08 AM
JOINT MOTION to Vacate by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company. (Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings Fri 09/16 10:07 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings Discovery due by 12/2/2022. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2023 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501 before Judge Robin J. Cauthron. (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL SCHEDULING DATES). Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 09/16/22. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 11/01 11:54 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial reset for 2/14/2023 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501 before Judge Robin J. Cauthron. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Terminate Hearings Tue 11/01 11:57 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial RESET for 2/14/2023 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501 before Judge Robin J. Cauthron. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
25 25 motion Extend Deadlines or Hearings Thu 09/15 3:38 PM
JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company. (Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
24 24 order Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 07/15 10:45 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 07/15/22. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
23 23 motion Protective Order Thu 07/14 2:22 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company.(Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order
22 22 notice ~Notice (other) Thu 07/14 11:40 AM
NOTICE (other) by Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC re20 Amended Answer to Complaint Notice of Election to Take Issue with Garnishee's Answer(Hays, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit Journal Entry of Judgment,
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Mailing Journal Entry of Judgment,
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons
21 21 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 07/14 11:32 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel C Hays on behalf of Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC (Hays, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
20 20 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 07/13 11:44 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company. (Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 07/12 11:36 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Substitute Counsel and to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elise M Horne and Perry E Kaufman terminated. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 07/12/22. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
18 18 motion Appoint Counsel Withdraw as Attorney Mon 07/11 1:43 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Substitute Counsel , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC. (Kaufman, Perry)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Fri 07/08 1:00 PM
ORDER granting16 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer. Defendant Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company is authorized to file its Amended Answer within five (5) business days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 07/08/2022. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
16 16 motion Leave Wed 07/06 4:00 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to file Amended Answer by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company. (Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/31 1:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 12/6/2022 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501 before Judge Robin J. Cauthron. Discovery due by 10/3/2022. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL SCHEDULING DATES. Entered at the direction of Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 05/31/22. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
14 14 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Thu 05/26 3:38 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC. (Kaufman, Perry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
13 13 misc Docket Wed 05/11 3:51 PM
DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2022 @ 10:10 AM in Chambers before Judge Robin J. Cauthron. (wh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
12 12 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 04/20 8:28 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company. (Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Tue 04/19 4:51 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Amend Garnishee's Answer. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 4/19/22. (dtb)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement - LLC Tue 04/19 4:38 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC . (Horne, Elise)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Tue 04/19 2:22 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC . (Horne, Elise)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Leave Tue 04/19 11:11 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company.(Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/19 9:51 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Elise M Horne on behalf of Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC (Horne, Elise)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice ~Notice (other) Tue 04/19 9:47 AM
NOTICE (other) by Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC re1 Notice of Removal,,, take issue with Garnishee's Answer (Kaufman, Perry)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Mon 04/18 4:42 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company . (Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 04/18 4:29 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Perry E Kaufman on behalf of Garvin County Towing & Recovery LLC (Kaufman, Perry)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 04/18 1:12 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Austin T Jackson on behalf of Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company (Jackson, Austin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 04/18 1:09 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry R Lewis on behalf of Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company (Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/15 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of McClain County, case number CJ-21-185 filed by Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company.(dtb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Entry of Appearance for Plaintiff Garvin,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Summons and Proof of Service for A&A,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Plaintiff Garvin's Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Journal Entry of Judgment,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Affidavit of Mailing Journal Entry of Judgment,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 Garnishment Affidavit,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 Garnishment Summons and Proof of Service for Hallmark,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 Hallmarks Answer to Garnishment Affidavit,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 Hallmarks Notice of Service on A&A,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 Notice of Removal (to be filed in State Court),
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Fri 04/15 4:52 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Removal Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3889851. (Lewis, Kerry)
Related: [-]