Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott W Everett
Case #: 3:22-bk-30681
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2022
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Plan Confirmed:May 04, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
NB Hotels Dallas LLC
13402 Noel Rd
Dallas, TX 75240-5004
Represented By
Joyce W. Lindauer
Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
313 313 order Final decree Tue 03/26 12:36 PM
Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 3/26/2024 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
312 312 notice Notice (generic) Fri 03/22 4:50 PM
Notice of Payment of U.S. Trustee Fees filed by Debtor NB Hotels Dallas LLC. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]