Stroup v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-01256 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 16, 2022 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Edward Stroup
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 8:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Edward Stroup, Terry Stroup (Partial Dismissal of Prostate Cancer Claims Without Prejudice) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01256-RMG(Diamond, David) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
39
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/30 11:55 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company, The, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products Inc, Chemguard Inc, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, Clariant Corporation, Corteva Inc, Du Pont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, filed by Edward Stroup, Terry Stroup. Service due by 12/2/2024 (Diamond, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 4/19/2022), Stroup v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1256-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern California (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/20 9:20 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 04/20 9:44 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 4/19/2022), Stroup v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1256-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern California (sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 19, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/20 9:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10449602.), filed by Edward Stroup. Service due by 7/18/2022(sshe, ) |