Randazzo v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-02492 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:22-cv-00854 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 19, 2022 1:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Randazzo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago |
Friday, May 13, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Nicholas Randazzo] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Nicholas Randazzo] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Nicholas Randazzo] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
Tuesday, April 26, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00854. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Tue 04/26 2:06 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Eastern, 2:22cv00854 Randazzo v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-02492-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 326 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, April 01, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp) | |
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) | |
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |