Dataken Incorporated v. Lumen Technologies Service Group, LLC
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Charlotte N Sweeney |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01017 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 25, 2022 4:49 AM MDT |
Defendant
Lumen Technologies Service Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dataken Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
187 | 187
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Tue 04/16 10:26 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the text-only ORDER filed in this case on 4/16/24 at ECF No. 186. Text Only Entry (jdyne) |
|
186 | 186
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 04/16 9:23 AM
ORDER granting185 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. The Court orders that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 4/16/2024. Text Only Entry(cnsja, ) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
185 | 185
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/15 6:36 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff Dataken Incorporated. (Defosse, Jonathan) |