Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:22-cv-01645
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2022
Terminated:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 23, 2022 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Tomeka Bentley
Defendant
Judge Kevin Farmer
Defendant
Tonja Richardson
Defendant
Carol Willingham
Plaintiff
Carl Hill
P. O. Box 5553
Atlanta, GA 31107

GPO Feb 12 2024
ORDER: The Court finds that Hill's Complaint fails to state a claim and is thereforefrivolous. This case is DISMISSED. Hill may file an amended Section 1983 claimagainst Judge Farmer for damages in his individual capacity only within 30 daysof this Order. If Hill fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, this case will be deemed dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/12/2024. (tas)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 18, 2024
6 6 9 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/19 11:44 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kevin Farmer with Jury Demand filed by Carl Hill. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
5 5 19 pgs order Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous Mon 02/12 4:47 PM
ORDER: The Court finds that Hill's Complaint fails to state a claim and is thereforefrivolous. This case is DISMISSED. Hill may file an amended Section 1983 claimagainst Judge Farmer for damages in his individual capacity only within 30 daysof this Order. If Hill fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, this case will be deemed dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/12/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 02/12 4:23 PM
Remark: Docket reviewed; no conflicts identified. (slc)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/12 4:48 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carl Hill re5 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 02/12 4:53 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
3 3 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/13 11:49 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carl Hill.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 2 pgs order Order ruling on IFP ~Util -Service of Process Shall Not Issue Tue 09/13 11:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, that Service of Process shall not issue at present time. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to submit this case to the assigned district judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915.1 Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 09/13/2022. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 09/13 11:50 AM
Submission of3 Complaint, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg for frivolity determination. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 09/13 12:05 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carl Hill re2 Order ruling on IFP,, Order that Service of Process shall not issue at present time. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/27 10:05 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/27 10:04 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Carl Hill.(eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet