Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Robert R Summerhays
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:22-cv-01127
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 25, 2022 4:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Government of St Martin Parish
Represented By
Steven M Oxenhandler
Gold Weems Et Al
contact info
Michael J O'Shee
Gold Weems Et Al
contact info
Defendant
USA
Represented By
Jennifer B Frederick
U S Attorneys Office (laf)
contact info
Jerry Edwards
U S Attorneys Office (shv)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government
Represented By
Gregory J Logan
Logan Law Firm
contact info
James H Gibson
Gibson Law Partners
contact info
Michael O Adley
Gibson Law Partners
contact info


1. Federal magistrate recommends dismissal of LCG lawsuit (katc.com)
Submitted Thu 03/16/2023
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
86 86 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Tue 03/21 11:31 AM
ORDER granting85 Motion for Extension. Response due 4/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/21/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
85 85 motion Extension (Other) Tue 03/21 9:24 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Response to Report and Recommendation with consent by Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/21/2023.(aty,Adley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/21 11:31 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re70 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Government of St Martin Parish. Objections to R&R due by 4/12/2023 (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
84 84 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 03/15 2:31 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re70 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Government of St Martin Parish Objections to R&R due by 3/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/15/2023. (crt,Jordan, P)
Related: [-]