Alabama Northern District Court
Judge:Corey L Maze
Case #: 2:22-cv-00541
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2022
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, 01-cv-22-900929
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 26, 2022 4:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Richard Carson
Represented By
Brannon J Buck
Badham & Buck LLC
contact info
Christopher B Driver
Badham & Buck LLC
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Shabo
Represented By
Ethan Andrew Wilkinson
Wineberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC
contact info
Jonathan B Head
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial
contact info
Defendant
Trane US Inc
Represented By
Stanley Edward Blackmon
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
contact info
Steven R Lindemann
Stinson LLP
contact info
Riley Alexander McDaniel
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Benjamin D. Eastburn
Stinson, LLP
contact info
Matthew H Lembke
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Birmingham, City of
Represented By
Robert Ashby Pate
Lightfoot Franklin & White
contact info
John M Johnson
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info

GPO Feb 06 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 2/6/2023. (KSS)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2022 2:20 PM CDT
Friday, April 29, 2022
State court complaint deemed filed 3/30/2022. See Doc1 , Exhibit 1, pages 3-28. (KEK)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trane US Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2022-900929.(KEK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 90 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2-3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2-4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2-5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2-6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 2-7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 3,
Att: 10 Exhibit 4,
Att: 11 Exhibit 5,
Att: 12 Exhibit 6
2 2 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims by Trane US Inc. (Lembke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 Brief re2 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims . (Lembke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Trane US Inc.(Lembke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane US Inc. filed by Trane US Inc (Lembke, Matthew)
Related: [-]