North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Case #: 5:22-cv-00182
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:May 04, 2022
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 31, 2022 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Cashdan
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Matthew W. Sawchak
Robinson Bradshaw Hinson, P.A.
contact info
Stephen D. Feldman
Robinson Bradshaw Hinson, P.A.
contact info
James M. Brigman
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Zachary A. McEntyre
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Julia C. Barrett
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Allison H. White
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Cashdan
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Matthew W. Sawchak
Robinson Bradshaw Hinson, P.A.
contact info
Stephen D. Feldman
Robinson Bradshaw Hinson, P.A.
contact info
James M. Brigman
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Zachary A. McEntyre
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Julia C. Barrett
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Allison H. White
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Mediator
Bonnie Weyher
Plaintiff
Diana Dasalla
Represented By
Jeremy R Williams
Milberg Coleman Bryson Philips Grossman PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Henson
Represented By
Jeremy R Williams
Milberg Coleman Bryson Philips Grossman PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
121 121 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion to Seal Document Tue 12/10 1:35 PM
ORDER granting 115 Motion to Seal Document and 118 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 12/10/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]