Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi K Dubose
Referred: Sonja F Bivins
Case #: 1:22-cv-00184
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause20:1681 Title IX Educational Amendments 1992 - Sex Discrimination
Case Filed:May 05, 2022
Terminated:Feb 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 01, 2022 4:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Joel Erdmann
Represented By
Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Christine Elizabeth H. Hart
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jinni Frisbey
Represented By
Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Christine Elizabeth H. Hart
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Patricia Gandolfo
Represented By
Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Christine Elizabeth H. Hart
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Alexis Meeks-Rydell
Represented By
Celia J. Collins
Johnstone, Adams, Bailey, Gordon & Harris
contact info
Defendant
Chris Moore
Represented By
Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Christine Elizabeth H. Hart
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale, LLC
contact info
Defendant
University of South Alabama
Represented By
Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Christine Elizabeth H. Hart
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rob Chilcoat
Represented By
Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Christine Elizabeth H. Hart
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cassadi Colbert
Represented By
Eli Hare
Dicello Levitt Gutzler
contact info
Allison Renee Griffith
Dicello Levitt Gutzler LLC
contact info
Diandra S. Debrosse Zimmermann
Dicello Levitt Gutzler LLC
contact info

GPO Feb 06 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Chris Moore, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Joel Erdmann, University of South Alabama, Rob Chilcoat and 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternativately, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Response to Plaintiff Colbert's Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydell be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/6/2024. (meh)
GPO Feb 26 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Chris Moore, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Joel Erdmann, University of South Alabama, Rob Chilcoat and 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternativately, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Response to Plaintiff Colbert's Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydel. The motions to dismiss are GRANTED and 1) the federal and state law claims against the University of South Alabama are dismissedwith prejudice; 2) the federal claims against the individual University defendants Joel Erdmann, Jinni Frisbey, Chris Moore, Rob Chilcoat and Patricia Gandolfo and Alexis Meeks-Rydell are dismissed with prejudice. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Colberts remaining state law claims against Erdmann, Frisbey, Moore, Chilcoat, Gandolfo, Meeks-Rydell, and therefore, these claims are dismissed without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/26/2024. (meh)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, February 26, 2024
37 37 order Judgment Mon 02/26 9:21 AM
JUDGMENT - It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/26/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Mon 02/26 8:54 AM
ORDER ADOPTING35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Chris Moore, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Joel Erdmann, University of South Alabama, Rob Chilcoat and29 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternativately, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Response to Plaintiff Colbert's Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydel. The motions to dismiss are GRANTED and 1) the federal and state law claims against the University of South Alabama are dismissedwith prejudice; 2) the federal claims against the individual University defendants Joel Erdmann, Jinni Frisbey, Chris Moore, Rob Chilcoat and Patricia Gandolfo and Alexis Meeks-Rydell are dismissed with prejudice. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Colberts remaining state law claims against Erdmann, Frisbey, Moore, Chilcoat, Gandolfo, Meeks-Rydell, and therefore, these claims are dismissed without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/26/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
utility Motions Referred Wed 02/21 10:11 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
35 35 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 02/06 3:35 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Chris Moore, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Joel Erdmann, University of South Alabama, Rob Chilcoat and29 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternativately, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Response to Plaintiff Colbert's Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydell be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/6/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
utility Document Referred Thu 05/25 11:44 AM
REFERRAL OF33 Reply to Response to Motion,34 Reply Brief, to Judge Bivins. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
34 34 respm Reply Brief Wed 05/24 10:31 PM
REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Rob Chilcoat, Joel Erdmann, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Chris Moore, University of South Alabama re:26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Rob Chilcoat, Joel Erdmann, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Chris Moore, University of South Alabama. (Hart, Christine)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/24 6:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion29 filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydell. (Collins, Celia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
utility Document Referred Thu 05/18 11:52 AM
REFERRAL OF32 Response in Opposition to Motion,31 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Bivins. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/17 5:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternativately, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Response to Plaintiff Colbert's Amended Complaint filed by Cassadi Colbert. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/17 5:17 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Cassadi Colbert. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/26 2:37 PM
Order re:26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Chris Moore, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Joel Erdmann, University of South Alabama, Rob Chilcoat and29 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternativately, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Response to Plaintiff Colbert's Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydell. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to the motion on or before 5/17/2023. Any reply by Defendants due by 5/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/26/2023. (meh)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 04/26 11:01 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:29 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternativately, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Response to Plaintiff Colbert's Amended Complaint Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (meh)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 04/26 1:17 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment no longer referred to Judge Dubose. Motion now referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (meh)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Wed 04/26 1:46 PM
REFERRAL OF28 Evidentiary Material to Judge Bivins. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
29 29 motion Dismiss Tue 04/25 7:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or Alternativately, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Response to Plaintiff Colbert's Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydell. (Collins, Celia)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Evidentiary Material Tue 04/25 2:43 PM
Evidentiary Material filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydell. (Collins, Celia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/25 9:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting25 Alexis Meeks-Rydell's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/25/23. (khc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
26 26 motion Dismiss Fri 04/21 4:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Rob Chilcoat, Joel Erdmann, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Chris Moore, University of South Alabama. (Bitzer, Windy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/21 10:24 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydell. (Collins, Celia)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Fri 04/21 2:39 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Referred to Judge DuBose. (cjr)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Fri 04/21 4:19 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or for Summary Judgment . Referred to DJ DuBose. (cjr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/07 12:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cassadi Colbert. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
23 23 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/03 1:15 PM
Case re-assigned to District Judge Kristi K. DuBose and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. District Judge Terry F. Moorer, Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order Mon 04/03 1:15 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Until recently, the undersigned was unaware that this lawsuit had a related case previously filed. See Demarcus v. Univ. of S. Ala. , Civ. Act. No. 1:21-cv-380-KD-B. In accordance with the first-filed policy, this case is reassigned to the same district judge and magistrate judge as the first-filed case. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/3/2023. (mab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/29 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Rehm on behalf of Alexis Meeks-Rydell Related [+]
Related: [-] hm, Elizabeth
20 20 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/29 11:26 AM
Order GRANTING11 MOTION to Dismiss,12 MOTION to Dismiss to the extent the Court finds Plf's complaint is a shotgun pleading. Plf is ORDERED to file an amended complaint by 4/7/2023 as set out. The remainder of the11 ,12 MOTIONS to Dismiss &/or for Summary Judgment are DENIED as moot with leave to refile if appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/29/23. (tot)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/29 10:07 AM
NOTICE by Rob Chilcoat, Joel Erdmann, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Chris Moore, University of South Alabama re12 MOTION to Dismiss Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment of Supplemental Authority (Bitzer, Windy)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Wed 03/29 11:01 AM
REFERRAL OF19 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
utility Document Referred Mon 08/22 10:47 AM
REFERRAL OF18 Reply to16 Response to12 Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (mab)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/19 5:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion12 to Dismiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydell. (Collins, Celia)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/19 2:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion11 filed by Rob Chilcoat, Joel Erdmann, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Chris Moore, University of South Alabama. (Bitzer, Windy)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Fri 08/19 4:13 PM
REFERRAL OF17 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss &/or for Summary Judgment to Judge Moorer. (tot)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
utility Document Referred Fri 08/12 11:06 AM
REFERRAL OF15 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss &/or for Summary Judgment,16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss &/or Summary Judgment to Judge Moorer. (tot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/11 5:11 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cassadi Colbert. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/11 5:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cassadi Colbert. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
14 14 2 pgs order Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing Wed 07/13 3:51 PM
ORDER re:11 Defendants Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment and12 Defendant Alexis Meeks-Rydells Motion to Dismiss, Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file any response by 8/11/2022. Defendants shall have until 8/19/2022, to file any reply that they may wish to file, after which the undersigned will take the matter under submission. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/13/2022. (fz)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/13 8:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Elizabeth H. Hart on behalf of Rob Chilcoat, Joel Erdmann, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Chris Moore, University of South Alabama (Hart, Christine)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Wed 07/13 12:41 PM
REFERRAL OF11 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION for Summary Judgment,12 MOTION to Dismiss, Aternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment to Judge Moorer. (tot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
12 12 motion Dismiss Tue 07/12 5:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alexis Meeks-Rydell. (Collins, Celia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
11 11 motion Dismiss Tue 07/12 1:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Rob Chilcoat, Joel Erdmann, Jinni Frisbey, Patricia Gandolfo, Chris Moore, University of South Alabama. (Bitzer, Windy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, May 16, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/16 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eli Hare on behalf of Cassadi Colbert (Hare, Eli)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/16 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Renee Griffith on behalf of Cassadi Colbert (Griffith, Allison)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/16 8:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassadi Colbert. Rob Chilcoat waiver sent on 5/13/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/16 8:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassadi Colbert. Joel Erdmann waiver sent on 5/13/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/16 8:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassadi Colbert. Jinni Frisbey waiver sent on 5/13/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/16 8:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassadi Colbert. Patricia Gandolfo waiver sent on 5/13/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/16 8:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassadi Colbert. Chris Moore waiver sent on 5/13/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/16 8:40 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassadi Colbert. University of South Alabama waiver sent on 5/13/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/16 8:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassadi Colbert. Alexis Meeks Rydell waiver sent on 5/12/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/05 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3006355, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/3/2022. (Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet