USA v. Porter, et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 3:22-cr-00162 |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 15, 2023 6:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
Joshua Brandon (2)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Fields (4)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Johnson, III (3)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kaylee Overmyer (7)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicholas Porter (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katelynn Skelly (6)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Eric Westphal (8)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Leon Bonifacio (5)
Terminated: 01/09/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/26/2024 10:06 AM EDT |
Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/14/2022 filed by USA as to Anthony Johnson, III (1). (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
1 | 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/14/2022 filed by USA as to Joshua Brandon (1). (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
Att: 1 7 pgs Affidavit | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/14/2022 filed by USA as to Nicholas Porter (1). (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | |
Att: 1 7 pgs Affidavit | ||
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
Arrest of Joshua Brandon (1) on 3/15/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | ||
Case unsealed as to Joshua Brandon (1). (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | ||
Scheduling Order as to Joshua Brandon (1), Initial Appearance set for 3/16/2022 at 09:15 AM be held by video conference (Toledo) before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Video conference access information to be provided to all participants in advance of hearing. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/15/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | ||
Arrest of Nicholas Porter (1) in Southern District of Texas. (K,AR) [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | ||
Case unsealed as to Nicholas Porter (1). Defendant arrested in the Southern District of Texas. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | ||
Wednesday, March 16, 2022 | ||
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Initial Appearance as to Joshua Brandon (1) held on 3/16/2022. Government appeared by attorney Alissa Sterling; Defendant appeared with Federal Public Defender Donna Grill; Officer Cheryce Burton appeared for U.S. Pretrial Services. All participants consented to appear via audio/video conference. Charges read. Parties advised of the Due Process Protections Act. Financial affidavit executed and approved. Office of the Federal Public Defender appointed to represent defendant. Defendant waived preliminary hearing and the matter is bound over to the grand jury. Government moved for detention. Detention Hearing set for 3/18/2022 03:30 PM to be held by video conference (Toledo). Defendant ordered temporarily detained. (Court Reporter ECRO Megan Frate) Time: 20 minutes. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | ||
Order [non-document] as to Joshua Brandon (1). Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Government's counsel is advised of and ordered to comply with the government's disclosure requirements under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny; and reminded that failure to comply with those disclosure obligations in timely manner could result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by the Court. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/16/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | ||
Order [non-document] Appointing Federal Public Defender Donna M. Grill for Joshua Brandon. The Federal Public Defender is reminded of counsel's obligation to report significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. CJA Plan, Part IV (D)(2). Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/16/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | ||
4 | 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joshua Brandon (1). Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/16/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
5 | 5 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Joshua Brandon (1). (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
6 | 6 Temporary Order of Detention as to Joshua Brandon (1). Detention Hearing set for 3/18/2022 03:30 PM to be held by video conference. Video conference access information to be provided to all participants in advance of hearing. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/16/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
Thursday, March 17, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 Notice of Appearance of Attorney - Claire R. Cahoon appearing for Joshua Brandon (1) /Substitution of Counsel (Cahoon, Claire) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
8 | 8 Notice of Appearance of Attorney - Krysten E. Beech appearing for Joshua Brandon (1) as Co-Counsel (Beech, Krysten) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
Friday, March 18, 2022 | ||
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Detention Hearing as to Joshua Brandon (1) held on 3/18/2022. Government appeared by attorney Alissa Sterling; Defendant appeared with Federal Public Defender Claire Cahoon; Officer Jordan Spadafore appeared for U.S. Pretrial Services. All participants consented to appear via audio/video conference. Charges read. Government and Defendant proffered certain evidence. Testimony received from proposed custodian Michael Brandon. Argument held. The Court takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter ECRO Megan Frate) Time: 1 hour 38 minutes. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | ||
9 | 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3 15-2022 in case as to Joshua Brandon (1). (F,M) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
Arrest of Anthony Johnson, III (1) on 3/21/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | ||
Case unsealed as to Anthony Johnson, III (1). (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | ||
Scheduling Order as to Anthony Johnson, III (1), Initial Appearance set for 3/22/2022 at 02:00 PM to be held by video conference (Toledo) before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Video conference access information to be provided to all participants in advance of hearing. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/21/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | ||
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Initial Appearance as to Anthony Johnson, III (1) held on 3/22/2022. Government appeared by attorney Ava Rotell Dustin; Defendant appeared with attorney Paul Frankel, retained; Officer Cheryce Burton appeared for U.S. Pretrial Services. All participants consented to appear via audio/video conference. Charges read. Parties advised of the Due Process Protections Act. Defendant requested Preliminary hearing. Preliminary Examination set for 4/7/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 224. Government moved for detention. Detention Hearing set for 3/24/2022 03:00 PM to be held by video conference. Defendant ordered temporarily detained. (Court Reporter ECRO Jessica Hancock) Time: 30 minutes. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | ||
Order [non-document] as to Anthony Johnson, III (1). Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Government's counsel is advised of and ordered to comply with the government's disclosure requirements under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny; and reminded that failure to comply with those disclosure obligations in timely manner could result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by the Court. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/22/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | ||
3 | 3 Notice of Appearance of Attorney Paul D. Frankel - appearing for Anthony Johnson, III (1). (Frankel, Paul) Modified text on 3/22/2022 (R,Ke). [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | |
3 | 3 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Nicholas Porter (1)(K,AR) [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Electronic Filings, | ||
Att: 4 Order Appointing Counsel for Limited Purpose, | ||
Att: 5 Order, | ||
Att: 6 Order to Detain Defendant Temporarily Under 18 USC 3142(d), | ||
Att: 7 Order of Detention Pending Hearing, | ||
Att: 8 Order Requiring Defendant to Appear in the District Where Charges are Pending and Transferring Bail, | ||
Att: 9 Commitment to Another District | ||
4 | 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/21/2022 in case as to Anthony Johnson, III (1). (F,M) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | |
6 | 6 Temporary Order of Detention as to Anthony Johnson, III (1). Detention Hearing set for 3/24/2022 03:00 PM to be held by video conference. Video conference access information to be provided to all participants in advance of hearing. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/22/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | |
10 | 10 Order of Detention as to Joshua Brandon (1). Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/22/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
Wednesday, March 23, 2022 | ||
11 | 11 7 pgs Amended Order of Detention as to Joshua Brandon (1). Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/23/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
Thursday, March 24, 2022 | ||
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Detention Hearing as to Anthony Johnson, III (1) held on 3/24/2022. Government appeared by attorney Ava Rotell Dustin; Defendant appeared with attorney Paul Frankel; Officer Cheryce Burton appeared for U.S. Pretrial Services. All participants consented to appear via audio/video conference. Government and Defendant proffered certain evidence. Testimony received from proposed custodian Loretta Marshall. Argument held. Defendant released on a $10,000 unsecured bond with terms and conditions as stated on the record. (Court Reporter ECRO Megan Frate) Time: 1 hour 15 minutes. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | ||
8 | 8 Appearance Bond Entered as to Anthony Johnson, III (1) in amount of $ 10,000.00, unsecured. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | |
9 | 9 Order Setting Conditions of Release. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/24/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | |
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
10 | 10 Notice of Discovery Request as to Anthony Johnson, III (1) (Frankel, Paul) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | |
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
Scheduling Order as to Nicholas Porter (1), Initial Appearance set for 4/1/2022 at 02:00 PM to be held by video conference (Toledo) before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Video conference access information to be provided to all participants in advance of hearing. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/31/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | ||
Friday, April 01, 2022 | ||
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Initial Appearance as to Nicholas Porter (1) held on 4/1/2022. Government appeared by attorney Alissa Sterling; Defendant appeared with attorney Phillip Carlisle; Officer Jordan Spadafore appeared for U.S. Pretrial Services. All participants consented to appear via audio/video conference. Charges read. Parties advised of the Due Process Protections Act. Defendant waived preliminary hearing and the matter is bound over to the grand jury. Government moved for detention. Defendant waived detention hearing without prejudice. Defendant ordered detained. (Court Reporter ECRO Megan Frate) Time: 15 minutes. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | ||
Order [non-document] as to Nicholas Porter (1). Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Government's counsel is advised of and ordered to comply with the government's disclosure requirements under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny; and reminded that failure to comply with those disclosure obligations in timely manner could result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by the Court. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/1/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | ||
4 | 4 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Porter (1). (Carlisle, Phillip) Modified text on 4/1/2022 (R,Ke). [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | |
12 | 12 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Request by Joshua Brandon (1) for proceedings held on 3/18/2022 before Judge Clay. Court Reporter: ECRO. Requested completion date: 14 day (Cahoon, Claire) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Nicholas Porter (1). (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | |
6 | 6 Waiver of Detention Hearing and Order of Detention as to Nicholas Porter (1). Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/5/2022. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05072-DAC] | |
13 | 13 2 pgs Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Joshua Brandon (1) re11 Order of Detention (Cahoon, Claire) [3:22-mj-05073-DAC] | |
Wednesday, April 06, 2022 | ||
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,JL) | ||
Counts added: Anthony Johnson, III (3) count(s) 5-6. (R,Ke) | ||
11 | 11 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Anthony Johnson, III (1). Preliminary Examination set for 4/7/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 224 is VACATED. (R,Ke) [3:22-mj-05074-DAC] | |
14 | 14 52 pgs UNSEALED INDICTMENT filed by USA as to Nicholas Porter (1) count(s) 1, 3-6, 12, 13, 17, 20, 25-27, 31-35, 37-38, Joshua Brandon (2) count(s) 1, 3-6, 10, 14, 15, 19, 21-24, 28-31, 36, Anthony Johnson, III (3) count(s) 1, 12, 26, 33, Joseph Fields (4) count(s) 1, 2, 7, 16, 18, Leon Bonifacio (5) count(s) 1, 9, 27, 35, 38, Katelynn Skelly (6) count(s) 8, 19-20, 32, Kaylee Overmyer (7) count(s) 25, 29, 34, 36-37, John Eric Westphal (8) count(s) 11, 21-24, 28, 30. (H,JL) Indictment unsealed on 4/8/2022 (R,Ke). | |
Att: 1 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 2 Signature Page | ||
Att: 3 (4/14/2022) Indictment (Text Searchable) (H,JL). (Entered: 04/07/2022 | ||
20 | 20 2 pgs Motion to Seal Indictment by United States of America as to Nicholas Porter (1), Joshua Brandon (2), Anthony Johnson, III (3), Joseph Fields (4), Leon Bonifacio (5), Katelynn Skelly (6), Kaylee Overmyer (7), John Eric Westphal (8). (H,JL) | |
21 | 21 Order granting USA's20 Motion to Seal Indictment as to Nicholas Porter (1), Joshua Brandon (2), Anthony Johnson III (3), Joseph Fields (4), Leon Bonifacio (5), Katelynn Skelly (6), Kaylee Overmyer (7), John Eric Westphal (8) Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/6/2022. (H,JL) |