Rehn v. Motil
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10571
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10571
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Arthur I Harris |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01036 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Matthew M. Motil
7011 Chadbourne Drive
North Olmsted, OH 44070 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Rehn
403 Fort Ranch Road
Georgetown, TX 78633 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Saturday, October 14, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
BNC
Notice of Order to Dismiss Case
Sun 10/15 12:10 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 10/14/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Dismissing Case (PDF)
Thu 10/12 10:02 AM
Order Dismissing Case as moot and without prejudice Signed on 10/11/2023 . (mgaug crt) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 09/25 10:08 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1036 Closed (mgaug) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
court
Hearing Held - CHAP ADI
Wed 08/02 12:12 PM
Hearing Held -- CONCLUDED; DISMISSED AS MOOT -- (jl) |
||
Sunday, June 18, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
BNC
Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF)
Mon 06/19 12:15 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Notice Date 06/18/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Set Hearing (PDF)
Fri 06/16 12:34 PM
Order to Set Hearing Signed on 6/15/2023 . Hearing scheduled for 8/2/2023 at 11:00 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug crt) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
court
Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI
Thu 04/27 9:14 AM
Hearing Not Held -- TRIAL CONTINUED; ORDER 3/29/23 (#16) -- (jl) |
||
Saturday, April 22, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Response
Sat 04/22 11:05 AM
Response to (Answer to Amended Complaint) Filed by Matthew M. Motil (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/05 10:26 AM
Amended Complaint by Eric R. Neuman on behalf of Lori Rehn against Matthew M. Motil. . (Neuman, Eric aty) |
|
Sunday, April 02, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
BNC
Notice of Order (PDF)
Mon 04/03 12:12 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/02/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order (PDF)
Fri 03/31 7:19 AM
Order Continuing Trial Signed on 3/29/2023 . (mgaug crt) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
court
Hearing Held - CHAP ADI
Tue 03/28 2:58 PM
Hearing Held -- COURT TO ISSUE ORDER -- (jl) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Reply
Mon 03/20 2:26 PM
Reply to Defendant's Objection to the Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial Filed by Lori Rehn (Neuman, Eric aty) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
misc
Memorandum in Opposition to
Mon 03/13 5:04 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial Filed by Matthew M. Motil . (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 02/24 2:16 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Plaintiff Lori Rehn . Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (Neuman, Eric aty) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Continue Hearing
Fri 02/24 2:15 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On Trial Filed by Lori Rehn (Neuman, Eric aty) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (PDF)
Thu 01/19 5:17 PM
Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Lori Rehn Filed by Matthew M. Motil. (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (PDF)
Wed 12/28 4:36 PM
Notice (Notice of Service of Defendant's Discovery Requests to Plaintiff) Filed by Matthew M. Motil. (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (PDF)
Wed 11/02 11:13 AM
Notice of Service by Plaintiff of First Written Discovery Requests upon Defendant Filed by Lori Rehn . (Neuman, Eric aty) |
|
Sunday, October 09, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
BNC
Notice of Scheduling Order
Mon 10/10 12:09 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 10/09/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order (PDF)
Fri 10/07 8:09 AM
Scheduling Order Signed on 10/6/2022 . Disclosure of Experts due by 12/30/22. Discovery due by 1/31/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/23. Stipulations of Fact, Witness Lists, Trial Briefs, Exhibit Lists, and Exhibits due by 4/20/23. Trial date set for 4/27/2023 at 09:00 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug crt) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Held - CHAP ADI
Wed 08/17 8:52 AM
Pre-trial Conference Held (at) |
||
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Continued - CHAP ADI
Tue 06/28 3:26 PM
Pre-trial Conference Continued . Pre-trial Conference scheduled for 08/16/2022 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (at) |
||
Saturday, June 18, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
BNC
Notice of Scheduling Order
Sun 06/19 12:09 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/18/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order (PDF)
Thu 06/16 9:59 AM
Scheduling Order Adjourning Pretrial Conference Signed on 6/15/2022 . Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/16/2022 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug crt) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Amended Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/09 3:00 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Matthew M. Motil (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 05/10 3:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Matthew M. Motil 5/10/2022 (Neuman, Eric aty) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Issued
Tue 05/10 8:24 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Matthew M. Motil Answer due 6/9/2022. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (jlund) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/06 4:01 PM
Adversary case 22-01036 Complaint by Lori Rehn against Matthew M. Motil. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit:62 (Dischargeability [523(a)(2) Fraud, False Pretenses, Actual Fraud; Rule 7001(6)]),67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny) (Neuman, Eric aty) |