Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10094

New Mexico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert H Jacobvitz
Case #: 1:22-ap-01010
Nature of Suit64 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(15), divorce or separation obligation (other than domestic support)
61 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(5), domestic support
Case Filed:May 10, 2022
Terminated:Sep 15, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Keith B Haynie
6505 Natalie Ave NE
Albuquerque, NM 87110
Represented By
Keith B Haynie
contact info
Defendant
Emily Lynn Haynie
6505 Natalie Ave NE
Albuquerque, NM 87110
Represented By
Emily Lynn Haynie
contact info
Plaintiff
Emily MacLeod
Represented By
Elizabeth Dranttel
Rose L. Brand & Associates, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, September 15, 2022
8 8 order Judgment (Order) Thu 09/15 5:22 PM
Stipulated Judgment Concerning Dischargeability. (cmw)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/15 5:26 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1010 Closed. Complaint granted as to Defendant Keith B. Haynie only. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
7 7 order Resulting from Scheduling Conference (Order) Fri 08/05 3:28 PM
Order Resulting from Scheduling Conference re1 Complaint. Discovery due by 9/19/2022. Pre-Trial Order to Defendants due by 10/7/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2022. Responses to any dispositive motions are due twenty-one days after the date of service of any such dispositive motion. Consolidated Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2022. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/2/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Jacobvitz's Brazos Courtroom. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
court Entry (Public - NEF will go to all parties) Tue 07/12 4:07 PM
Results of 7/12/22 Scheduling Conference. Counsel believes they can work out issues in adversary proceeding. Counsel for Plaintiff to email document to Counsel for Defendants. Court continues scheduling conference to August 5, 2022 at 10:00 am and will call attorneys for the continued scheduling conference. Court will vacate scheduling conference if a stipulated judgment or order of dismissal is submitted prior to the scheduling conference. Plf: Elizabeth Dranttel, phone; Defs: Cliff Gramer, phone. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/14 1:39 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Emily Lynn Haynie, Keith B Haynie Related [+]. (Gramer, Clifford)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Emily MacLeod
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/08 5:02 PM
Certificate of Service of Alias Summons served 06/07/2022; to those indicated on certificate Filed by Plaintiff Emily MacLeod Related [+]. (Dranttel, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 4 Alias Summons Issued
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
4 4 court Alias Summons Issued Tue 06/07 11:02 AM
Alias Summons Issued for service by Plaintiff upon Defendants Emily Lynn Haynie and Keith B Haynie. Date Issued 6/7/2022, Answer Due 7/7/2022 re1 Complaint. Scheduling conference to be held on 7/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Jacobvitz's Gila Courtroom. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/25 1:21 PM
Certificate of Service of Adversary Complaint served 05/19/2022; to those indicated on certificate Filed by Plaintiff Emily MacLeod Related [+]. (Dranttel, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, May 16, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 05/16 9:55 AM
Summons Issued for service by Plaintiff upon Defendants Emily Lynn Haynie and Keith B Haynie. Date Issued 5/16/2022, Answer Due 6/15/2022 re1 Complaint. Scheduling conference to be held on 6/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Jacobvitz's Gila Courtroom. (cmw)
Related: [-]
court Set Judge Code Flag Mon 05/16 9:51 AM
Set Judge Code Flag to JA (Jacobvitz-Albuquerque). (cmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/10 4:18 PM
Adversary case 22-01010 (61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)), (64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)): Complaint by Emily MacLeod against Keith B Haynie, Emily Lynn Haynie. Fee Amount $350. (Dranttel, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]