New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:22-cv-03822
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Case Filed:May 11, 2022
Last checked: Monday Nov 07, 2022 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
Eddy Alexandre
Represented By
Melissa Falk Wernick
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Emil Bove, III
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Defendant
Eminifx Inc.
Interested Party
Christopher Beil
Interested Party Kirschenbaum & Kirschenbaum PC 200 Garden City Plaza, Suite 315
Garden City, NY 11768
Interested Party
34th Street Suites LLC
369 Lexington Avenue, 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Lori A. Schwartz
Leech Tishman Robinson Brog PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Moshe Assis
718-344-1032 295 Madison Avenue Suite 977
New York, NY 10017
Interested Party
Sannecie Pongnon
Intervenor
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
United States Attorney's Office 1 St. Andrew's Plaza
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Jared P Lenow
Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By
Elizabeth M Streit
U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info
Douglas Snodgrass
U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info
Receiver
David A Castleman
Temporary Receiver One Rockefeller Plaza 10th Floor
New York, NY 10020
Represented By
Gerard Roger Luckman
Forchelli Deegan Terrana LLP
contact info
David Allen Castleman
Raines Feldman LLP
contact info
Kathy Bazoian Phelps
Raines Feldman LLP
contact info
Christina McPhaul
Raines Feldman LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 05/12/2022
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 05/12/2022


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 473. Mailed to: Eddy Alexandre Reg.No.00712-510 P.O. Box 1000 White Deer, PA 17887. (nb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
473 473 order Memo Endorsement Mon 04/28 10:51 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:472 Letter filed by Eddy Alexandre. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED. The Court denied the motion to intervene because it found that the CFTC and the Receiver have vigorously protected investors' interests over the course of this litigation. Accordingly, investors will not be prejudiced if this case proceeds pending the proposed intervenors' appeal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/28/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
472 472 2 pgs misc Letter Fri 04/25 5:06 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Pierre Acluche dated 4/2/2025 re: I hope this letter finds you well, and I wish you a happy Spring. My name is Pierre Acluche, an investor with EminiFX, Inc. who is acting on behalf of several other EminiFX Investors (named at the end). I respectfully request this Court to enter a stay in the proceedings pending the appeal of the denial to our motion to intervene (Second Circuit Court of Appeals Docket #: 25-632) on the grounds that the Government and the Receiver have demonstrated that they are not acting in the best interest of EminiFX Investors and only intervention can properly allow these interests to be represented.. Document filed by Eddy Alexandre..(nb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Appelllate Brief