Gordoa et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 5:22-cv-02900 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 12, 2022 1:33 AM PST |
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Luxshare-ICT, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
B.G.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Gordoa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ariani Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/20 2:35 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Schneider, Sara) |
|
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 07/20 3:25 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 19, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/19 6:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Mariam Chamilova Pro Hac Vice representing Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/19 6:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING 28 Application for Admission of Attorney Stephen M. Copenhaver Pro Hac Vice representing Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/19 6:13 PM
ORDER GRANTING 27 Application for Admission of Attorney Thomas M. Crispi Pro Hac Vice representing Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/19 9:59 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17362493) filed by Apple, Inc..(Chamilova, Mariam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
28 | 28
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/19 9:56 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17362484) filed by Apple, Inc..(Copenhaver, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
27 | 27
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/19 9:50 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17362433) filed by Apple, Inc.(Crispi, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
26 | 26
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/19 7:31 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carlos Gordoa.. (Paranjpe, Tej) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 07/18 3:45 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/1/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/28 10:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Gordoa. Luxshare-ICT, Inc. served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. (Paranjpe, Tej) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 06/22 4:22 PM
JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Luxshare-ICT, Inc.. (Blanche, Caitlin) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 06/21 6:43 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Schneider, Sara) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 06/21 6:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. (Schneider, Sara) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/15 3:01 PM
Summons Re-issued as to Defendant Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.. (tn, COURT STAFF) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Wed 06/15 12:57 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Carlos Gordoa as to Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.. (Paranjpe, Tej) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/13 12:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Gordoa. Apple, Inc. served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. (Paranjpe, Tej) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 06/13 8:20 AM
Proposed Summons. (Paranjpe, Tej) |
|
Friday, June 03, 2022 | ||
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 06/03 8:59 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiffs are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 6/17/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/23 4:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.. (tn, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/20 4:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING 13 Application for Admission of Attorney William Haacker Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/20 8:45 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number CCANDC-17193793.) filed by Carlos Gordoa.(Haacker, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 05/20 8:36 AM
Proposed Summons. (Paranjpe, Tej) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/19 1:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING 6 Application for Admission of Attorney Brent S. Phelps Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/19 12:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING 5 Application for Admission of Attorney Robert L. Horn Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/19 12:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING 4 Application for Admission of Attorney Tej Paranjpe Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/17 4:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc., Luxshare-ICT, Inc.. (slh, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 05/17 4:23 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/17 1:38 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17182987) filed by Carlos Gordoa.(Phelps, Brent) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/17 1:32 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17182960) filed by Carlos Gordoa.(Horn, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/17 1:29 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17182909) filed by Carlos Gordoa.(Paranjpe, Tej) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) | |
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Collins, Richard) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17179707). Filed by Carlos Gordoa, B.G., Ariani Reyes.(Collins, Richard) |