USA v. Ramos-Chavez et al
Oregon District Court | |
Case #: | 6:22-cr-00152 |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday May 21, 2022 12:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Armando Lugo-Bejarano (2)
|
|
Defendant
Richard Ramos-Chavez (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/21/2022 1:32 AM PDT |
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai as to Richard Ramos-Chavez: Initial Appearance is set for 3/23/2022 at 01:30PM in Eugene by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk) [6:22-mj-00053-MK] | |
Wednesday, March 23, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
8 | 8 Scheduling Order as to Richard Ramos-Chavez. The Preliminary Hearing set for 04/05/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke has been RESET for 4/6/2022 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [6:22-mj-00053-MK] | |
Friday, April 01, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
10 | 10 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai as to Richard Ramos-Chavez: Preliminary Hearing set for 4/6/2022 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke is VACATED. Arraignment is set for 4/20/2022 at 01:30PM in Eugene by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report in which they update the Court on the status of the case. The Joint Status Report shall include requests for additional waivers of time under the Speedy Trial Act and for presentment to the grand jury, if applicable. The Joint Status Report deadline set for 4/20/2022 is RESET for 4/11/2022. (jk) [6:22-mj-00053-MK] | |
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Friday, April 15, 2022 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai as to Richard Ramos-Chavez: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Status Report11 . At the request of counsel, an additional 45 days, from 3/23/2022 to 5/7/2022, are ordered waived under the Speedy Trial Act for presentation of this matter to the grand jury to continue its investigation. The Court finds that the ends of justice served by granting the continuance outweigh the best interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report in which they update the Court on the status of the case. The Joint Status Report shall include requests for additional waivers of time under the Speedy Trial Act and for presentment to the grand jury, if applicable. The Joint Status Report is due by 4/25/2022. Arraignment set for 4/20/2022 at 01:30PM in Eugene by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai is VACATED. (jk) [6:22-mj-00053-MK] | |
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |