Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Federico A Moreno
Case #: 0:22-cv-60988
Nature of Suit871 Federal Tax Suits - IRS-Third Party 26 USC 7609
Cause26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Case Filed:May 24, 2022
Terminated:Sep 15, 2022
Last checked: Monday Nov 21, 2022 5:03 AM EST
Petitioner
United States Of America
Represented By
Jeremy A. Rill
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Amy Matchison
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Juan Antonio Gonzalez, Jr.
United States Attorney'S Office - H.I.D.T.A.
contact info
Respondent
Kevin W. Wessell
Represented By
Martin R. Press
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Edward Alan Marod
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 15, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 09/15 2:24 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case in light of the Parties reaching a settlement. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (er02)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 09/13 9:15 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States Of America (Rill, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
22 22 misc Transcript Fri 08/19 12:07 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 07-20-22 before Judge Federico A. Moreno, 1-109 pages, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2022. (Pastor-Hernandez, Gilda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
21 21 2 pgs order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing Thu 07/21 5:18 PM
Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (lfk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
20 20 minutes Evidentiary Hearing Thu 07/21 12:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Evidentiary Hearing held on 7/20/2022. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
18 18 3 pgs misc Stipulation Tue 07/19 10:53 AM
STIPULATION of Facts by United States Of America (Rill, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
19 19 1 pgs minutes Telephone Conference Tue 07/19 1:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Telephone Conference held on 7/18/2022. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sc)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs trial Exhibit and Witness List Mon 07/18 9:35 AM
Exhibit and Witness List by United States Of America.. (Rill, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
15 15 8 pgs respm Response/Reply (Other) Fri 07/15 11:15 AM
REPLY to13 Answer to Petition to Enforce IRS Summons by United States Of America. (Rill, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
order Order Setting Status Conference Fri 07/15 2:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Status Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/18/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno, in order to discuss the witnesses to be called in view of the pleadings filed that indicate limited factual disputes. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/15/2022. (lfk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 07/13 2:57 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Rescheduling Evidentiary Hearing set for Thursday, July 21, 2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Due to unavailability of court reporters resulting from their attendance at the National Convention on July 21 and 22, the evidentiary hearing is rescheduled for WEDNESDAY, JULY 20, 2020 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/13/2022. (lfk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
14 14 trial Exhibit and Witness List Mon 07/11 10:40 AM
Exhibit and Witness List by Kevin W. Wessell.. (Marod, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
13 13 6 pgs answer Answer to Petition to Enforce IRS Summons Fri 07/08 11:32 AM
ANSWER to Petition to Enforce IRS Summons by Kevin W. Wessell. (Marod, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
12 12 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 06/29 9:48 AM
AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Telephone Conference held on 6/29/2022. (sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
11 11 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 06/28 12:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Telephone Conference held on 6/27/2022. (sc)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 06/27 4:23 PM
Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing. Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/21/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (lfk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/23 5:19 PM
NOTICE by Kevin W. Wessell re1 Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons,3 Memorandum, of filing affidavits in opposition (Marod, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Frederick E. Owens, Jr., J.D.,
Att: 2 Affidavit Martin R. Press, Esq.
utility ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 06/23 10:05 AM
Hearing terminated Per DE#8. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Wed 06/22 2:55 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Rescheduling4 Hearing on Motion. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for Monday, June 27, 2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. When both parties are on a single conference call line, they shall call chambers at (305) 523-5114. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/22/2022. (lfk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 06/21 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin R. Press on behalf of Kevin W. Wessell. Attorney Martin R. Press added to party Kevin W. Wessell(pty:res). (Press, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 06/20 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Alan Marod on behalf of Kevin W. Wessell. Attorney Edward Alan Marod added to party Kevin W. Wessell(pty:res). (Marod, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Fri 06/03 3:20 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by United States Of America (Rill, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 06/02 2:55 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (lfk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
3 3 15 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 05/24 4:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re1 Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons by United States Of America.(Rill, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Karen Cincotta,
Att: 2 Exhibit Clawback Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Privilege Log,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons Tue 05/24 3:40 PM
PETITION (Complaint) to Enforce IRS Summons . Filing fee $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States Of America.(Rill, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 05/24 4:01 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
Related: [-]