USA v. Lee
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:22-cr-00230 |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday May 28, 2022 12:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Mitchell Vaughn Lee (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/28/2022 1:08 AM PDT |
Thursday, May 12, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee in violation of 18:922(g)(1) Felon in Possession of a Firearm. Approved by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Mitchell Vaughn Lee (1). (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee; defendants Year of Birth: 1971; date of arrest: 5/12/2022 (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
8 | 8 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth as to Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Georgina Wakefield for Mitchell Vaughn Lee, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/31/2022 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 6/6/2022 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Court Smart: CS 05/16/2022. (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
9 | 9 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
10 | 10 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee. (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
11 | 11 CONSENT to Video Conference/Telephonic Conference filed by Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee. (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
12 | 12 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 05/31/2022 at 11:30 AM and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 06/06/2022 at 11:30 AM before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
13 | 13 ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth as to Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee, (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
14 | 14 ABSTRACT OF COURT PROCEEDING Issued by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth as to Mitchell Vaughn Lee. Recommended that the defendant be Provided with a medical examination and/or medical treatment. (cio) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
Tuesday, May 17, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Ijeoma Uchechi Eke on behalf of Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee. Filed by Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee. (Attorney Ijeoma Uchechi Eke added to party Mitchell Vaughn Lee(pty:dft))(Eke, Ijeoma) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the Federal Public Defenders Office,4 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
6 | 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee Notice of Appearance (Eke, Ijeoma) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
Thursday, May 19, 2022 | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender J Alejandro Barrientos on behalf of Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee. Filed by Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee. (Attorney J Alejandro Barrientos added to party Mitchell Vaughn Lee(pty:dft))(Barrientos, J) [2:22-mj-01906-DUTY] | |
Wednesday, May 25, 2022 | ||
16 | 16 INDICTMENT Filed as to Mitchell Vaughn Lee (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in Los Angeles. (mat) | |
17 | 17 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Julia Hu as to Defendant Mitchell Vaughn Lee; defendants Year of Birth: 1971 USMS# 07329-509 (mat) |