New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00374
Case Filed:May 31, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 9:38 AM EDT
Defendant
MARC SCHESSEL (1)
Represented By
ANGELA LI
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
CHRISTOPHER DYESS
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
JAMES M. ROBERTS
contact info
JAMES ROBERTS
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
DOUGLAS ERIC GROVER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Movant
Carole Bernstein, Esq.
Represented By
SARAH FEHM STEWART
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
JOHN B. MCCUSKER
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Movant
Law Offices of Carole R. Bernstein
Represented By
SARAH FEHM STEWART
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
JOHN B. MCCUSKER
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Movant
John Nossiff, Esq.
Represented By
SARAH FEHM STEWART
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
JOHN B. MCCUSKER
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Movant
SCWorx
Represented By
SARAH FEHM STEWART
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
JOHN B. MCCUSKER
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Movant
The Nossiff Law Firm, LLP
Represented By
SARAH FEHM STEWART
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
JOHN B. MCCUSKER
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
GEORGE BRANDLEY
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
ROBERT SPENCER RYAN
Doj-Crm
contact info
CAROLYN A. SILANE
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
LUCY BETH JENNINGS
Doj-Crm
contact info
ANGELICA M SINOPOLE
United States Attorney'S Office - District Of New Jerse
contact info
SEAN MICHAEL SHERMAN
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Nov 21 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to MARC SCHESSEL re 17 MOTION for Victim Rights Alternative Notification Procedures filed by USA. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/21/2022. (msd)

Docket last updated: 07/08/2024 12:02 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
Notice of Allocation and Assignment as to MARC SCHESSEL [Newark - Judge Esther Salas] (msd)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT as to MARC SCHESSEL (1) counts 1, 2. (msd)
Related: [-]