Voller v. Motil
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10571
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10571
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Arthur I Harris |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01047 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e) 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Matthew M. Motil
7011 Chadbourne Drive
North Olmsted, OH 44070 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayla Voller, KAYLA VOLLER
10588 Severn Lane
Parker, CO 80134 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Saturday, October 14, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
BNC
Notice of Order to Dismiss Case
Sun 10/15 12:10 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 10/14/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismissing Case (PDF)
Thu 10/12 9:38 AM
Order Dismissing Case as moot and without prejudice Signed on 10/11/2023 . (mgaug crt) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 09/25 10:09 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1047 Closed (mgaug) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
court
Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI
Wed 08/02 1:38 PM
Hearing Not Held CONCLUDED;DISMISSED AS MOOT. (mr) |
||
Sunday, June 18, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
BNC
Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF)
Mon 06/19 12:15 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Notice Date 06/18/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Set Hearing (PDF)
Fri 06/16 12:41 PM
Order to Set Hearing Signed on 6/15/2023 . Hearing scheduled for 8/2/2023 at 11:00 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug crt) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
court
Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI
Thu 04/27 9:03 AM
Hearing Not Held . TRIAL CONTINUED; ORDER 3/29/23 (#10) (mr) Modified on 4/27/2023 (mrive) |
||
Sunday, April 02, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
BNC
Notice of Order (PDF)
Mon 04/03 12:12 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/02/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order (PDF)
Fri 03/31 7:21 AM
Order Continuing Trial Signed on 3/29/2023 . (mgaug crt) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (PDF)
Thu 01/19 4:53 PM
Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Kayla Voller Filed by Matthew M. Motil. (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (PDF)
Wed 12/28 11:21 PM
Notice (Notice of Service of Defendant's First Discovery Directed to Plaintiff) Filed by Matthew M. Motil. (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Sunday, October 09, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
BNC
Notice of Scheduling Order
Mon 10/10 12:09 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 10/09/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order (PDF)
Fri 10/07 10:13 AM
Scheduling Order Signed on 10/6/2022 . Discovery due by 1/31/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/23. Trial date set for 4/27/2023 at 09:00 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug crt) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Wed 08/17 8:20 AM
Pretrial Held -- COURT TO ISSUE SCHEDULING ORDER -- (jlund) |
||
Tuesday, August 02, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI
Tue 08/02 2:02 PM
Pretrial Adjourned Pretrial adjourned to 08/16/2022 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (jl) |
||
Monday, July 04, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/04 11:54 AM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Matthew M. Motil (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Saturday, June 18, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
BNC
Notice of Scheduling Order
Sun 06/19 12:09 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/18/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
order
Scheduling Order (PDF)
Thu 06/16 9:50 AM
Scheduling Order Adjourning Pretrial Conference Signed on 6/15/2022 . Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/16/2022 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug crt) |
|
Friday, June 03, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Issued
Fri 06/03 1:49 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Matthew M. Motil Answer due 7/5/2022. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/2/2022 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (jlund) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/03 11:07 AM
Adversary case 22-01047 Complaint by Kayla Voller against Matthew M. Motil. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit:62 (Dischargeability [523(a)(2) Fraud, False Pretenses, Actual Fraud; Rule 7001(6)]),67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny),41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)),68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) (Byron, Evan aty) |