T-Mobile US, Inc. et al v. KAIFI LLC
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00192 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 30, 2022 2:56 AM CST |
Defendant
KAIFI LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
David Folsom
dfolsom@jw.com Jackson Walker LLP 6002-B Summerfield Drive
Texarkana, TX 75503 |
|
Plaintiff
T-Mobile US, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T-Mobile USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/23 3:54 PM
USCA 5th Circuit Notice: original eROA has been accepted. (NKL) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
246 | 246
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/22 3:12 PM
ORDER denying244 Motion to Docket Appeal in the Noticed Court of Appeals. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/22/2024. (NKL) |