California Eastern District Court
Judge:No District Court Judge
Case #: 1:22-cv-00671
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2022
Terminated:Dec 13, 2022
Petitioner
Mark Randall Fawcett
Respondent
Warden

GPO Oct 14 2022
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 6 First Amended Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 10/14/2022. Referred to Judge Ana de Alba. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
GPO Dec 13 2022
ORDER ADOPTING 8 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 6; ORDER DECLINING to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 12/13/2022. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
GPO Dec 27 2023
ORDER DENYING 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel on Appeal; ORDER Directing Clerk to Forward Motion to Ninth Circuit signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 12/27/2023. (Flores, E)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 29, 2024
17 17 appeal USCA Order/Mandate/Memo Thu 02/29 5:25 PM
USCA ORDER as to11 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Randall Fawcett. DENIED. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 12/27 4:08 PM
ORDER DENYING14 Motion to Appoint Counsel on Appeal; ORDER Directing Clerk to Forward Motion to Ninth Circuit signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 12/27/2023. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
15 15 2 pgs misc Order Reassigning No District Court Judge (NODJ) Fri 12/08 9:01 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the elevation of U.S. District Judge Ana I. de Alba to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, the court finds it necessary to temporarily reassign this case to No District Court Judge (NODJ) until a new district judge is appointed. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 12/08 9:02 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:15 Order Reassigning No District Court Judge (NODJ), served on Mark Randall Fawcett. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
14 14 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 12/07 1:06 PM
MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL ON APPEAL by Mark Randall Fawcett. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
12 12 appeal Appeal Processed to USCA Thu 01/12 8:54 AM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re11 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Randall Fawcett. Notice of Appeal filed *1/11/2023*, Complaint filed *6/3/2022* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *12/13/2022*. Court Reporter: *None*. *Fee Status: IFP Granted on 6/6/2022* (Rivera, O)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Information
service Service by Mail Thu 01/12 8:55 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:12 Appeal Processed to USCA served on Mark Randall Fawcett. (Rivera, O)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 01/12 12:08 PM
USCA CASE NUMBER 23-15040 for11 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Randall Fawcett. (Rivera, O)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
11 11 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 01/12 8:52 AM
NOTICE of APPEAL by Mark Randall Fawcett as to9 Order,10 Judgment. (Rivera, O)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
10 10 order Judgment Tue 12/13 3:14 PM
JUDGMENT dated *12/13/2022* pursuant to order (Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 12/13 3:13 PM
ORDER ADOPTING8 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus6 ; ORDER DECLINING to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 12/13/2022. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 12/13 3:15 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:10 Judgment,9 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Mark Randall Fawcett. (Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
8 8 motion Findings and Recommendations Fri 10/14 2:16 PM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss6 First Amended Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 10/14/2022. Referred to Judge Ana de Alba. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Fri 10/14 2:14 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-00671-ADA-HBK(HC) . (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 10/14 2:16 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Mark Randall Fawcett. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
6 6 cmp Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 09/07 1:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS; Order to Show Cause; Notice of Request for Court Appointed Lawyer by Mark Randall Fawcett. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
misc Mail Returned Thu 08/18 12:08 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, No Such Number:4 Screening Order sent to Mark Randall Fawcett at John Latoracca Correctional Facility, 2584 W. Sandy Mush Rd., El Nido, CA 95317. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 08/18 12:11 PM
PETITIONER'S ADDRESS UPDATED to John Latoracca Correctional Facility, 2584 W. Sandy Mush Rd., Merced, CA 95340 as indicated on Doc.1 . (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 08/18 12:11 PM
RE-SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Screening Order served on Mark Randall Fawcett. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 08/18 12:13 PM
RE-SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider,2 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Mark Randall Fawcett. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
4 4 order 08 - Screening Order Tue 07/19 12:43 PM
ORDER Granting Leave to File a First Amended Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 7/19/2022. First Amended Petition due within thirty (30) days . (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 07/19 12:43 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order served on Mark Randall Fawcett. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
misc Mail Returned Mon 06/27 2:14 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward:3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider sent to Mark Fawcett at 2854 West Sandy Mush Road, El Nido, CA 95317. Notice of Change of Address due by 9/6/2022. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
3 3 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Mon 06/06 3:45 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Standing Order issued re Petition filed on *6/3/2022* *(Doc. No. 1).* Consent or Decline due by 7/11/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Litigant Letter,
Att: 2 HBK Standing Order
2 2 order 05 - HC/Order Authorizing IFP Mon 06/06 3:44 PM
ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Mark Randall Fawcett, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 06/06/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Mon 06/06 3:46 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Mark Randall Fawcett. (Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 06/06 3:43 PM
PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Warden by Mark Randall Fawcett.(Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]