Hawaii District Court
Judge:Jill A Otake
Referred: Wes Reber Porter
Case #: 1:22-mc-00294
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jun 09, 2022
Terminated:Oct 07, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM HST
Friday, October 07, 2022
11 11 order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Fri 10/07 2:15 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Cenwood Telecom Company Ltd., GSM Club LLC - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (jni)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/15 8:34 AM
EO: The parties notified the Court that they reached a settlement. The current briefing deadlines are VACATED. The parties are directed to submit dismissal documents to otake_orders@hid.uscourts.gov by 10/17/22. (shm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 08/24 1:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR THIRD EXTENSION OF BRIEFING DEADLINES AS TO MOVANTS' MOTION [ECF NO.1 ] re8 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 8/24/2022. The parties' Motion is GRANTED. The United States shall be allowed up to and including September 19, 2022 to respond to the Motion for Return of Property. Movants may submit an optional reply by no later than October 3, 2022. (eta)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 08/24 11:23 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Deadlines As To Movants Motion [ECF No. 1] Sydney Spector appearing for Respondent U.S. Government(Spector, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion For Third Extension Of Briefing Deadlines As To Movants Motion [ECF No. 1]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 08/03 7:50 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF BRIEFING DEADLINES AS TO MOVANTS' MOTION [ECF NO. 1] re6 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 8/2/2022. The parties' Motion is GRANTED. The United States shall be allowed up to and including August 29, 2022, to respond to the Motion for Return of Property. Movants may submit an optional reply by no later than September 12, 2022. (jni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 08/02 3:37 PM
STIPULATION re1 MOTION for Return of Property ; STIPULATED MOTION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF BRIEFING DEADLINES AS TO MOVANTS MOTION [ECF NO. 1] by U.S. Government. (Spector, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/18 3:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOVANTS MOTION [ECF NO.1 ] re4 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 7/18/2022. The United States shall be allowed up to and including August 8, 2022, to respond to the Motion for Return of Property. Movant may submit an optional reply by no later than August 22, 2022. (eta)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 07/15 1:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 MOTION for Return of Property ; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF SYDNEY SPECTOR; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Sydney Spector appearing for Respondent U.S. Government(Spector, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Sydney Spector
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
minutes 2 - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R) Tue 06/14 11:01 AM
EO: The Court elects to address1 Movants GSM Club LLC and Cenwood Telecom Company Ltd.'s Motion for Return of Property Pursuant to the Court's Equitable Jurisdiction and/or Pursuant to F.R.Cr.P. Rule 41(g) without a hearing pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c). The government's response is due by 7/18/22 and Movants' reply is due by 8/1/22. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
1 1 2 pgs motion Return of Property Thu 06/09 2:13 PM
Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee/USA Applications Movants GSM Club LLC and Cenwood Telecom Company Ltd.'s Motion for Return of Property Pursuant to the Court's Equitable Jurisdiction and/or Pursuant to F.R.Cr.P. Rule 41(g) Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AHIDC-2692792., filed by GSM Club LLC.(Benedict, Thomas) Modified on 6/9/2022 (jni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24 pgs Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 70 pgs Exhibits 1-11,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 06/09 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Miscellaneous case number MC 22-00294 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings . (jni)
Related: [-]