District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00178
Case Filed:May 20, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jun 19, 2022 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
DONTE MINTZ (1)
Represented By
Michael E. Lawlor
Brennan, Mckenna & Lawlor, Chartered
contact info
Matthew Wilson
Price Benowitz LLP
contact info
David Barry Benowitz
Price Benowitz LLP
contact info
Nicholas George Madiou
Brennan, Mckenna & Lawlor, Chartered
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kristina Cervi
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Angela Nichole Buckner
U.S. Attorney'S Office Doj/usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/19/2022 3:41 AM EDT
Thursday, July 08, 2021
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to DONTE MINTZ (1). (bb) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Statement of Facts
Friday, July 09, 2021
Arrest of DONTE MINTZ (1). (zpt) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DONTE MINTZ (1). (zpt) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Temporary Detention by USA as to DONTE MINTZ (1). (zpt) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: VTC Initial Appearance as to DONTE MINTZ (1) held on 7/9/2021. Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel by DONTE MINTZ (1) Heard and Granted. Oral Motion for Temporary Detention (3 Day Hold) by DONTE MINTZ (1) Heard and Granted. Detention Hearing set for 7/14/2021 at 04:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Committment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR Gold FTR Time Frame: CTRM 6 [2:12:33-2:22:52]; Defense Attorney: Michael Lawlor; US Attorney: April Russo; Pretrial Officer: Christine Schuck; (zpt) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/9/2021 as to DONTE MINTZ (1). (zpt) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael E. Lawlor appearing for DONTE MINTZ (Lawlor, Michael) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Filing - Discovery Letter by DONTE MINTZ(Lawlor, Michael) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Discovery Letter
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicholas George Madiou appearing for DONTE MINTZ (Madiou, Nicholas) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
8 8 9 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Pre-Trial Detention of Defendant Donte Mintz by USA as to DONTE MINTZ (Russo, April) Modified event title on 7/26/2021 (znmw). [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
ENTERED IN ERROR..... Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: VTC Continued Detention Hearing as to DONTE MINTZ (1) held on 7/14/2021. Matter was held but did not conclude. Continued Detention Hearing set for 7/20/2021 at 04:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains Committed; Court Reporter: FTR Gold FTR Time Frame: CTRM 6 [3:09:08-4:15:07]; Defense Attorney: Elizabeth Toplin and Kathleen Gaughan; US Attorney: Melissa Jackson; Pretrial Officer: John Copes; (zpt) Modified on 7/14/2021 (zpt). [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by DONTE MINTZ (1). (zpt) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: VTC Status Hearing as to DONTE MINTZ (1) held on 7/14/2021. Matter was set for a Detention Hearing but was not held. Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing by DONTE MINTZ (1) Heard and Granted. Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 7/29/2021 at 03:30 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains Committed; Court Reporter: FTR Gold FTR Time Frame: CTRM 6 [4:29:36-4:42:19]; Defense Attorney: David Benowitz and Matthew Wilson; US Attorney: April Russo; Pretrial Officer: John Copes; (zpt) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Barry Benowitz appearing for DONTE MINTZ (Benowitz, David) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew Peter Wilson appearing for DONTE MINTZ (Wilson, Matthew) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
11 11 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and for Excludable Delay by USA as to DONTE MINTZ. (Russo, April) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER granting11 Motion to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to DONTE MINTZ (1). Preliminary/Detention Hearing continued to 8/30/2021 at 3:30 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 7/28/2021. (ztl) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION to Exclude by USA as to DONTE MINTZ. (See DE11 to view document). (bb) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
MINUTE ORDER: It has come to the Court's attention that the parties meant to continue only Defendant's preliminary hearing, rather than his preliminary hearing and detention hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties appear for a detention hearing on August 3, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. The Court notes that the time between July 29, 2021 and August 3, 2021 is excluded from calculation under the Speedy Trial Act due to the pendency of the government's motion for pretrial detention. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 7/30/2021. (ztl) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
Set/Reset Hearings as to Defendant DONTE MINTZ : Detention Hearing reset from 4:00 PM on 8/3/2021 to 3:00 PM on 8/3/2021 by telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. (kk) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
ORAL MOTION by USA to Commit Defendant DONTE MINTZ to the Custody of the U.S. Attorney General. (kk) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
JOINT ORAL MOTION by USA and Defendant DONTE MINTZ to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act from 8/3/2021 until 8/30/2021. (kk) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for Detention Hearing as to DONTE MINTZ held by video before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 8/3/2021 : Oral Motion by USA to Commit Defendant to the Custody of the U.S. Attorney General, heard, argued and denied. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/30/2021 at 3:30 PM by telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Joint Oral Motion by USA and Defendant to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act from 8/3/2021 until 8/30/2021, heard and granted in the interest of justice. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant released on Personal Recognizance Bond, to include Home Incarceration with GPS monitoring, into the Third-Party Custody Supervision of his mother. Release issued. Court Reporter: FTR Gold - Ctrm. 7; FTR Time Frame: 3:07:04 - 5:10:08. Defense Attorneys: David Benowitz and Matthew Wilson; U.S. Attorney: April Russo; Pretrial Officer: Shay Holman; Proposed Third-Party Custodian (Defendant's mother): Robbye Braxton. (kk) Modified on 8/10/2021 (kk). [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release : Defendant DONTE MINTZ released on Personal Recognizance Bond, including Home Incarceration with Global Positioning System Monitoring and Third-Party Custody Supervision; signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 8/4/2021. (Attachment: Appearance Bond) (kk) Modified on 8/10/2021 (kk). [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
16 16 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and for Excludable Delay by USA as to DONTE MINTZ. (Russo, April) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
18 18 MOTION for Excludable Delay by USA as to DONTE MINTZ. (See DE16 to view document ). (bb) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
17 17 ORDER Granting16 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and for Excludable Delay by USA as to DONTE MINTZ. Time between 8/30/2021 and 10/20/2021 (51 Days) shall be excluded from calculation under the Speedy Trial Act in the interest of justice X-T. Preliminary Hearing continued to 10/20/2021 at 11:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 8/30/2021. (zpt) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
19 19 Consent MOTION to Continue PRELIMINARY HEARING AND FOR EXCLUDABLE DELAY by USA as to DONTE MINTZ.(Russo, April) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
22 22 MOTION for Excludable Delay by USA as to DONTE MINTZ. (See DE19 to view document). (bb) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
21 21 ORDER granting19 Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing as to DONTE MINTZ (1). Preliminary Hearing continued to 12/13/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 10/20/2021. (ztl) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
23 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Angela Nichole Buckner appearing for USA. (Buckner, Angela) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
24 24 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and for Excludable Delay by USA as to DONTE MINTZ.(Buckner, Angela) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
27 27 MOTION for Excludable Delay by USA as to DONTE MINTZ. (See DE24 to view document). (bb) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
26 26 ORDER granting24 Consent Motion by USA to Continue Preliminary Hearing and for Excludable Delay as to Defendant DONTE MINTZ; continuing the currently scheduled Preliminary Hearing on 12/13/2021 to 2/25/2022 at 2:00 PM by telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather; excluding the time from 12/13/2021 through 2/25/2022 from calculation under the Speedy Trial Act in the interest of justice; signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 12/10/2021. (kk) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
29 29 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing , Consent MOTION to Exclude Time by USA as to DONTE MINTZ.(Buckner, Angela) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 24, 2022
31 31 ORDER granting29 Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing and to Exclude Time as to DONTE MINTZ (1). Preliminary Hearing continued to 3/31/2022 at 4:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 2/24/2022. (ztl) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
32 32 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by USA as to DONTE MINTZ (Russo, April) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
34 34 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing , Consent MOTION to Exclude Time by USA as to DONTE MINTZ.(Buckner, Angela) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
35 35 ORDER Granting34 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing, Consent MOTION to Exclude Time by USA as to DONTE MINTZ (1). Time between 3/31/2022 and 6/14/2022 (75 Days) shall be excluded from calculation under the Speedy Trial Act in the interest of justice X-T. Preliminary Hearing continued to 6/14/2022 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 3/30/2022. (zpt) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
Set/Reset Hearings as to DONTE MINTZ:Status Hearing set for 5/4/2022 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. (zcll) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather: Status Hearing as to DONTE MINTZ held on 5/4/2022. Minute Order Forthcoming. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant remains on PR/3rd Party Custodian. Court Reporter: FTR - GOLD; FTR Time Frame: Crtm 7 [1:11:40 - 1:27:29]. Defense Attorney: Rammy Barbari for David Benowitz; US Attorney: Angela Buckner; Pretrial Officer: Masharia Holman; Witness: Robbye Braxton (Mother). (zcll) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to Defendant DONTE MINTZ: Mr. Mintzs conditions of release are modified as follows: the third-party custodian SHALL remove all portable internet capable devices, excluding any security system, when the third-party custodian leaves the residence for in-person work on Mondays. All other release conditions imposed by the Court shall remain the same. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 5/4/2022. (zcll) [1:21-mj-00519-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
37 37 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to DONTE MINTZ (1) count(s) 1, 2. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION). (zstd)
Related: [-]