New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Lois H Goodman
Case #: 3:22-cv-04162
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2022
Terminated:Jul 18, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Dec 18, 2022 5:18 AM EST
Defendant
HOLLAND & KNIGHT (LAW FIRM)
Defendant
ANDREW SOVEN
Plaintiff
GENESE LIEBERMAN
1072 MADISON AVENUE
LAKEWOOD, NJ 08701


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Monday, July 18, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 07/18 4:18 PM
ORDER that the Court construes Plaintiff's motion to withdraw her complaint as a request for voluntary dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/18/2022. (abr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/08 10:01 AM
Set Deadlines as to5 MOTION to Withdraw. Motion set for 8/1/2022 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
5 5 motion Withdraw Fri 07/08 10:00 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Complaint by GENESE LIEBERMAN Related [+] (abr, )
Related: [-] ceived via H.D
Thursday, June 30, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/30 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GENESE LIEBERMAN. HOLLAND & KNIGHT (LAW FIRM) served on 6/23/2022, answer due 7/14/2022. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Non-Prisoner Pro Se Filers Tue 06/28 2:45 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 06/22 2:36 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to HOLLAND & KNIGHT (LAW FIRM), ANDREW SOVEN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 06/22 2:35 PM
Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number TRE127138 (kht)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Wed 06/22 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT filed. See Docket Entry1 . (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/21 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT against HOLLAND & KNIGHT (LAW FIRM), ANDREW SOVEN with JURY DEMAND, filed by GENESE LIEBERMAN.(kht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet