Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald J Pappert
Case #: 2:22-cv-02571
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2022
Terminated:Aug 31, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2022 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
RENA BITTER
Represented By
VERONICA JANE FINKELSTEIN
U.S. Attorneys Office Edpa
contact info
Defendant
ANTONY J BLINKEN
Represented By
VERONICA JANE FINKELSTEIN
U.S. Attorneys Office Edpa
contact info
Defendant
ALEXANDRA MCKNIGHT
Represented By
VERONICA JANE FINKELSTEIN
U.S. Attorneys Office Edpa
contact info
Plaintiff
CAROLINE MARTIN EVENTING
Represented By
RENEE HYKEL CUDDY
Hykel Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/31 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CAROLINE MARTIN EVENTING (HYKEL CUDDY, RENEE)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/01 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by VERONICA JANE FINKELSTEIN on behalf of RENA BITTER, ANTONY J BLINKEN, ALEXANDRA MCKNIGHT with Certificate of Service(FINKELSTEIN, VERONICA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
5 5 service Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Wed 07/13 11:06 AM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
4 4 service Certificate of Service Thu 07/07 3:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CAROLINE MARTIN EVENTING (HYKEL CUDDY, RENEE)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 07/07 7:37 AM
Summons Issued as to RENA BITTER, ANTONY J BLINKEN, ALEXANDRA MCKNIGHT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
2 2 trial Exhibit Tue 07/05 1:19 PM
EXHIBIT by CAROLINE MARTIN EVENTING.. (HYKEL CUDDY, RENEE)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 07/05 9:07 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 07/01 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT against RENA BITTER, ANTONY J BLINKEN, ALEXANDRA MCKNIGHT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16019658.), filed by CAROLINE MARTIN EVENTING.(HYKEL CUDDY, RENEE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet