Peacock v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02101 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2022 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Sue Peacock
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Sullivan, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 7/1/2022), Peacock v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2101-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Florida (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/06 2:44 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 07/06 2:45 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 7/1/2022), Peacock v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2101-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Florida (sshe, ) |
||
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/06 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10571282.), filed by Sue Peacock. Service due by 9/29/2022(sshe, ) |