Gates v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02104 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2022 3:54 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Tom Gates
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Sat 04/13 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tom Gates Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-02104-RMG(Riemann, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 07/06 2:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 7/1/2022), Gates v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2104-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Maine (sshe, ) |
||
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/06 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10571354.), filed by Tom Gates. Service due by 9/29/2022(sshe, ) Modified document number on 7/6/2022 (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 4/15/2022), Ingrao v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1270-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Oregon (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/06 2:55 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, April 15, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10445169.), filed by Melinda Ingrao. Service due by 7/14/2022(sshe, ) |