Perry v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02137 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 8:22-cv-01434 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 02, 2023 3:57 AM EST |
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Individually and as Successor in Interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwall, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Individually and as Successor in Interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Corporation
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Individually and as Successor in Interest to Ciba, Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkemia, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Charles Russell Perry, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
order
Order
Thu 03/09 10:07 AM
TEXT ORDER The Court STRIKES Plaintiff's amended complaint for failure to comply with applicable CMOs and FRCP 15. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/9/2023. (sshe, ) |
||
misc
Entry Deletion
Thu 03/09 10:09 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 11 Reason: per Text Order at Dkt. No. 12 Filing date of original filing: 3/7/2023 (sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/07 1:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Russell Perry, III. Service due by 6/5/2023 (Patel, Shreedhar) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2022 | ||
10 | 10 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Maryland, 8:22-cv-01434, Perry v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2137-RMG (sshe, ) | |
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 07/07 2:06 PM
Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:22-cv-01434. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/5/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/7/2022.] | |
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/24/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/7/2022.] | |
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/7/2022.] | ||
Tuesday, June 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/14/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/7/2022.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Charles Russell Perry, III or counsel for Charles Russell Perry, III are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/28/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/7/2022.] | |
2 | 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Amerex Corporation, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkemia, Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemicals, Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, E. I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Kidd-Fenwall, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products, LP, UTC Fire & Security America's Corporation, United Technologies Corporation.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/7/2022.] | |
Monday, June 13, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL against AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Amerex Corporation, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkemia, Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemicals, Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Doe Defendants 1-20, Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, E. I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Incorporated, Kidd-Fenwall, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products, LP, UTC Fire & Security America's Corporation, United Technologies Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9990387.), filed by Charles Russell Perry, III.(Patel, Shreedhar) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/7/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons to Def. The 3M Co., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons to Def. ACG Chemicals Americas, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons to Def. Amerex Corp., | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons to Def. Archorma US, Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons Summons to Def. Arkema, Inc., | ||
Att: 7 Summons Summons to Def. BASF Corp., | ||
Att: 8 Summons Summons to Def. Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., | ||
Att: 9 Summons Summons to Def. Carrier Global Corp., | ||
Att: 10 Summons Summons to Def. ChemDesign Products, Inc., | ||
Att: 11 Summons Summons to Def. Chemguard, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Summons Summons to Def. Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Summons Summons to Def. Chubb Fire, Ltd., | ||
Att: 14 Summons Summons to Def. Clariant Corp., | ||
Att: 15 Summons Summons to Def. Corteva, Inc., | ||
Att: 16 Summons Summons to Def. Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 17 Summons Summons to Def. DuPont De Nemours, Inc., | ||
Att: 18 Summons Summons to Def. Dynax Corp., | ||
Att: 19 Summons Summons to Def. E. I. DuPont De Nemours & Co., | ||
Att: 20 Summons Summons to Def. Kidde PLC, Inc., | ||
Att: 21 Summons Summons to Def. Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., | ||
Att: 22 Summons Summons to Def. Nation Ford Chemical Co., | ||
Att: 23 Summons Summons to Def. National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 24 Summons Summons to Def. The Chemours Co., | ||
Att: 25 Summons Summons to Def. The Chemours Co. FC, LLC, | ||
Att: 26 Summons Summons to Def. Tyco Fire Products, LP, | ||
Att: 27 Summons Summons to Def. United Technologies Corp., | ||
Att: 28 Summons Summons to Def. UTC Fire & Security America's Copr. | ||
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. (kos, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/7/2022.] |