New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:22-cv-04557
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2022
Terminated:Dec 20, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 09, 2023 4:15 AM EST
Defendant
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
LORI BLAKE LESKIN
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
ANAND AGNESHWAR
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
Plaintiff
AMBER O'CONNOR
Represented By
CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Carella Byrne
contact info
JAMES E. CECCHI
Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C.
contact info
CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JUSTIN O'CONNOR
Represented By
CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Carella Byrne
contact info
JAMES E. CECCHI
Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C.
contact info
CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/20 11:24 AM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/20/2022. (ld, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/20 11:31 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Mon 12/19 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AMBER O'CONNOR, JUSTIN O'CONNOR (CECCHI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Wed 08/10 9:19 AM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint & Briefing Schedule; Plaintiffs shall respond to the joint motion on or before December 22, 2022. SEA and SEC shall have until January 23, 2023 to reply. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/9/2022. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 08/08 10:07 AM
STIPULATION and Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint & Briefing Schedule by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.. (LESKIN, LORI)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/08 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LORI BLAKE LESKIN on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (LESKIN, LORI)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/08 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANAND AGNESHWAR on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (AGNESHWAR, ANAND)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 07/15 5:37 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/14 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. CECCHI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CECCHI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/14 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE F. BARTLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BARTLETT, CAROLINE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
1 1 48 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/13 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13556512) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AMBER O'CONNOR, JUSTIN O'CONNOR.(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/14 10:16 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, )
Related: [-]