City of Taneytown v. 3M Company, The
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02222 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 08, 2023 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Taneytown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/17 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 05/05 2:33 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 3056 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; granting (175) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03432-RMG; granting (177) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03488-RMG; granting (10) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-02906-RMG; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-03120-RMG; granting (103) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-03434-RMG; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:20-cv-02384-RMG; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:20-cv-02812-RMG; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-00848-RMG; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-00851-RMG; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-01649-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03214-RMG; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03215-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03216-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03217-RMG; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03218-RMG; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-00179-RMG; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-00919-RMG; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-01078-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-02221-RMG; granting (6) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-02222-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-02823-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03118-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03119-RMG; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03870-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03871-RMG; granting (18) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03875-RMG) Motion to Withdraw M. Cristina Sanchez as Attorney for plaintiffs (as listed on Attachment A). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/5/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 05/02 10:53 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney M. Cristina Sanchez by Bakman Water Company, City of Sioux Falls, City of Galesburg, City of San Jose California, City of Burbank, Town of Barnstable, City of Salisbury, Town of Webster, Randi Burke, Thomas Burke, Asha Chacko, Joshua Chacko, Melisa Cunningham, Melanie Dortch, Ryan Dortch, Frederick Hays, Jr, Suzanne Hays, Lawrence Hettinger, Edie Huber, Brian King, Julia King, Christopher Kruegler, Kimberley Murphy, Sean Murphy, Gillian Price, Federico Raffa, Town of Maysville, Town of Danvers, Sacramento County Water Agency, City of Taneytown, Town of Poolesville, Town of Ayer, City of Downey, CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY, EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY, California Water Service Company, Sandwich Water District, Town of Ayer, City of Whittier. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment A | ||
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
misc
Entry Deletion
Wed 02/08 3:16 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5 (original) Reason: a new (non-MDL) Notice of Removal case was filed incorrectly Filing date of original filing: 2/8/2023 (sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
misc
Entry Deletion
Tue 01/31 4:03 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 4 (original) Reason: a new (non-MDL) Notice of Removal case was filed incorrectly Filing date of original filing: 1/31/2023 (sshe, ) |
||
Thursday, July 14, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 7/12/2022), City of Taneytown v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2222-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Maryland (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/14 12:44 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 07/14 12:45 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 7/12/2022), City of Taneytown v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2222-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Maryland (sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/14 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10587057.), filed by City of Taneytown. Service due by 10/11/2022(sshe, ) |