David Wilson v. Joseph Biden, Jr., et al
Original Case: 2:22-cv-01647
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02275 |
Type | civil / united states as party / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 13, 2022 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
STEVE WILSON, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant
GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant
STUART RABNER, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant
SHEILA Y. OLIVER, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant
MARC MCKITHEN, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL HARPER, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant
KENNETH S DOUGLAS, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant
VIC CARSTARPHEN, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
JUSTICE STUART RABNER, New Jersey Supreme Court Chief
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL HARPER, Camden City Fire Chief
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ, Camden County Police Chief
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
VIC CARSTARPHEN, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
KENNETH S DOUGLAS, Trenton Fire Commissioner
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE WILSON, Trenton Police Commissioner
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARC MCKITHEN, Trenton Municipal Court Chief
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
SHEILA Y. OLIVER, New Jersey Lieutenant Governor
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL A. SHIPP, USA District Court Judge
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN ROBERTS, USA Supreme Court Chief Justice
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
VICE PRESIDENT KAMALA HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
USA PRESIDENT JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
USA PRESIDENT JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
USA PRESIDENT KAMALA HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
USA PRESIDENT JOHN ROBERTS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID ALLEN WILSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/13/2022 4:26 AM EDT |
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. David Allen Wilson in District Court No. 2-22-cv-01647. (ARR) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Caption | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Caption | ||
2 pgs ORDER (Clerk) On May 23, 2022, Appellant filed a notice of appeal from the District Court order entered on March 25, 2022, in D. N.J No. 2-22-cv-01647. This appeal was docketed at No. 22-2012 On July 8, 2022, Appellant filed a second notice of appeal in the same District Court case from the District Court order entered on June 17, 2022. It is noted that the appeal at No. 22-2012 has been listed for possible dismissal for lack of jurisdiction. A separate order will be issued listing the appeal at No. 22-2275 for possible dismissal for lack of jurisdiction. As both notices of appeal were filed within a short span of time and as the cases have both been listed for possible dismissal, the cases will be consolidated and submitted to the same panel for jurisdictional review. It is noted that Appellant was recently granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the appeal at No. 22-2012 In light of this consolidation, Appellant's in forma pauperis status shall be applied to the appeal at No. 22-2275 22-2275 22-2012 (ARR) |