California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:22-cv-04223
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 1:05 AM PST
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Richard Wetzel
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Allison L Stillman
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Brittany Nichole Lovejoy
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Epidemic Sound, AB
Represented By
Ilene S. Farkas, I
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Adam Seth Cashman
Singer Cashman LLP
contact info
Maryaneh Mona Simonian
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Evan N. Budaj
Singer Cashman LLP
contact info
John Kilgard
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 28 2022
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 29 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
GPO Jan 13 2023
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/13/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2024 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 9/30/2024 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 9/30/2024 to 10/11/2024 (10-days) at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023) Modified on 1/13/2023 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
GPO Mar 30 2023
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/30/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2023)
GPO Apr 07 2023
Stipulated Clawback Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/7/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2023)
GPO May 09 2024
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3: AMENDED CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/9/2024. Pretrial Conference reset for 9/18/2025 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection reset for 10/6/2025 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial reset for 10/6/2025 to 10/20/2025 at 8:30 a.m. (10-days) in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. October 13, 2025 is a federal holiday.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
GPO Oct 10 2024
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT LETTER AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/10/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2024)
GPO Oct 16 2024
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4: FURTHER AMENDED CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/16/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2024)
GPO Jan 30 2025
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/30/2025. This Order disposes of Docket Nos. 202, 203, 209, 210, and 216.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2025)
GPO Mar 20 2025
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT LETTER ABOUT EPIDEMIC'S MONITORING AND ENFORCEMENT EFFORTS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/20/2025. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2025)

Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
265 265 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 04/01 8:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 264 Stipulation Extending Fact Deposition Deadline. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
264 264 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 03/31 7:57 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Fact Deposition Deadline filed by Meta Platforms, Inc..(Stillman, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Allison L. Stillman
263 263 misc Transcript Mon 03/31 8:40 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/25/2025 before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Robin L. Herrera, RMR, CRR, CRC, telephone number 843-364-7431. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 4/21/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2025. (Herrera, Robin)
Related: [-] 261 Transcript Order,260 Transcript Order(s)261 ,260
Thursday, March 27, 2025
262 262 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Letter Brief Thu 03/27 4:50 PM
ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY DISPUTE CONCERNING FEBRUARY 22, 2025 CLAWBACK OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on March 27, 2025. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
261 261 misc Transcript Order Wed 03/26 1:36 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/25/2025 before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Epidemic Sound, AB, for Court Reporter Robin Herrera. (Maida, Brian)
Related: [-]
260 260 misc Transcript Order Wed 03/26 12:15 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/25/2025 before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Robin Herrera. (Lovejoy, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
259 259 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 03/25 9:33 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 257 Stipulation to Further Extending Deadline to Produce Licensing Agreements. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
258 258 minutes Discovery Hearing Tue 03/25 1:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Informal Discovery Hearing re: Cox's deposition held by Zoom videoconference on 3/25/2025. Court Reporter: Robin Herrera Attorneys for Plaintiff: Mona Simonian/Ilene Farkas/Marion Harris Attorney for Defendant: Britt Lovejoy (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2025)
Related: [-]