New Jersey District Court
Judge:John Michael Vazquez
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:22-cv-04738
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2022
Terminated:Nov 28, 2022
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF MORRIS COUNTY, MRS-L-001155-22
Last checked: Sunday Jan 22, 2023 4:30 AM EST
Defendant
TOWNSHIP OF PARSIPPANY TROY-HILLS
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AJACO TOWING, INC.
Represented By
ALAN R. ACKERMAN
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 28, 2022
9 9 misc Letter: Remand Mon 11/28 2:34 PM
Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Morris County Courthouse Washington & Court Streets Morristown, NJ 07963-0910 State No: MRS-L-001155-22. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jd, )
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Mon 11/28 2:31 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part4 Motion to Remand to State Court; remanding this matter to State Court and denying Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk of Court shall close this matter. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 11/28/2022. (jd, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 11/28 2:44 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
7 7 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 09/12 2:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support filed by AJACO TOWING, INC. re4 MOTION to Remand (ACKERMAN, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit "A",
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit "B"
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
6 6 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Tue 08/23 2:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by TOWNSHIP OF PARSIPPANY TROY-HILLS re4 MOTION to Remand (BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 respm Certification in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/23 2:41 PM
CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by TOWNSHIP OF PARSIPPANY TROY-HILLS re4 MOTION to Remand (BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/16 11:15 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 9/19/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
4 4 motion Remand Mon 08/15 4:37 PM
MOTION to Remand by AJACO TOWING, INC..(ACKERMAN, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Jason Cleffi,
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration for Legal Services,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service Acknowledgement of Service
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/27 11:21 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TOWNSHIP OF PARSIPPANY TROY-HILLS.(BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
2 2 misc Exhibit (to Document) Tue 07/26 2:08 PM
Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,,1 Notice of Removal by TOWNSHIP OF PARSIPPANY TROY-HILLS. (BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 07/26 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TOWNSHIP OF PARSIPPANY TROY-HILLS from SUPERIOR COURT OF MORRIS COUNTY case number MRS-L-1155-22. (Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13585860).(BARATZ, ALAN) Modified on 7/26/2022 (dam)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 07/26 10:44 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - If the party is already in the system, select it. Also, names are to be in all capital letters . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/26 10:48 AM
Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Tue 07/26 12:20 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam, )
Related: [-]