HANSON et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Rudolph Contreras |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-02256 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2023 5:44 AM EST |
Amicus
BRADY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
MARCH FOR OUR LIVES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT J. CONTEE, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATHAN CHANEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERIC KLUN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TYLER YZAGUIRRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW HANSON
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 20 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 8 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4-20-2023. (lcrc3) |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Fri 07/28 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. Attorney Andrew J. Saindon terminated. (Saindon, Andrew) |
|
Sunday, July 23, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Transcript
Sun 07/23 8:05 AM
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before the Honorable Rudolph Contreras held on 04/13/2023. Page Numbers: 1-33. Date of Issuance: 07/23/2023. Stenographic Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer. Telephone Number: 202-354-3118. Email: nancymeyercourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcripts may be ordered by going to www.dcd.uscourts.gov (left-hand side under Transcript Requests). For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats (multi-page, condensed, CD, or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 21 days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2023.(Meyer, Nancy J.) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 05/17 10:04 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re30 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztth) |
|
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 05/17 3:32 PM
USCA Case Number 23-7061 for30 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by TYLER YZAGUIRRE, ERIC KLUN, NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON. (znmw) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Tue 05/16 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-10072470. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lyon, George) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 05/04 10:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting29 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal: It is hereby ORDERED that this matter is STAYED until further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5 4-2023 (lcrc3) |
||
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Stay
Wed 05/03 7:17 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Saindon, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
40
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Thu 04/20 11:59 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION denying8 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4 20-2023 (lcrc3) |
|
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Thu 04/20 11:58 AM
ORDER denying8 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4 20-2023 (lcrc3) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 04/13 11:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Motion Hearing held on 4/13/2023 re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TYLER YZAGUIRRE, ERIC KLUN, NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON. Oral argument heard, and the court takes the motion under advisement. (Court Reporter: Nancy Meyer) (tj) |
||
Saturday, April 08, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Sat 04/08 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE(Lyon, George) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit The History of Bans on Types of Arms Before 1900 | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Thu 04/06 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA(Rave, Helen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Delaware State Sportsmen's Association, Inc. v. Delaware Department of Safety and Homeland Security Memorandum Opinion | ||
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 03/31 4:37 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23A- In Person before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 03/21 1:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court on April 13, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23 for oral argument on8 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The parties are advised that the procedures set forth in Local Civil Rule 65.1(d) shall govern this hearing. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3 21-2023 (lcrc3) |
||
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
notice
Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status
Tue 01/24 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re24 REPLY to opposition to motion re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE.(Lyon, George). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 1/31/2023. (zbaj) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 01/23 11:41 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE.(Lyon, George) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Ex. 1 Hanish Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Ex. 2 Helsley Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Ex. 3 Hlebinsky Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Ex 4 Givens Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration Ex. 5 Harnish Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration Ex. 6 Murphy Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Declaration Ex. 7 Ellifritz Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration Ex. 8 Werner Declaration, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 Examples of marketing of guns with magazines in excess of 10 rounds for self-defense, | ||
Att: 10 Declaration Ex. 10 Swearer Declaration, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex 11 Testimony of Massad Ayoob, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex, 12 Kopel,Bowie knife statutes, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. 13 Virginia historic machine gun statute, | ||
Att: 14 Declaration Ex. 14 Cramer Declaration, | ||
Att: 15 Declaration Ex, 15 Kleck Declaration | ||
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Withdrawal of Motion
Wed 01/11 9:09 AM
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE re22 Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by TYLER YZAGUIRRE, ERIC KLUN, NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON . (Lyon, George) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/10 6:15 PM
Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE.(Lyon, George) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order | ||
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Thu 12/22 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA(Rave, Helen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Ocean State Tactical, LLC et al v. Rhode Island et al Memorandum and Order | ||
Thursday, December 08, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Thu 12/08 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA(Rave, Helen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc. v. Brown Opinion and Order | ||
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 12/02 9:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the page limit for Plaintiffs' reply is increased to 35 pages and Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed on or before January 23, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12 2-2022 (lcrc3) |
||
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
motion
File Excess Pages Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 12/01 6:19 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Memorandum in Support by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE.(Lyon, George) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 12/01 1:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief: It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Amicus Curiae brief attached to the Motion at ECF No. 18-1 is deemed filed with this Court upon entry of this Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12 1-2022 (lcrc3) |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 11/30 8:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by BRADY, GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, MARCH FOR OUR LIVES.(Hester, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Amicus Curiae Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 11/23 4:33 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Kelley, Mateya) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit List, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A (Interrogs.), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B (Baron), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C (Givens excerpt), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D (Amodeo MPD), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E (Parsons MPD), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F (Pauly), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G (DeLay), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H (Spitzer), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I (Roth), | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J (Rivas), | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K (Barrett excerpt), | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L (Kinard excerpt), | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit M (Sweeney), | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit N (Sadowski excerpt), | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit O (Webster), | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit P (model law 1928), | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Q (Charles excerpt), | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit R (Smithsonian excerpt) | ||
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 10/31 2:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Preliminary Injunction Application by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE.(Lyon, George) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Tyler Yzaguirre, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 10/31 6:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting16 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Leave to File: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs may supplement their application for a preliminary injunction with the declaration of Tyler Yzaguirre attached at ECF No. 16-1. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10 31-2022 (lcrc3) |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/04 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Sobiecki on behalf of All Defendants (Sobiecki, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Expedite Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 09/07 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER: On August 19, 2022, Plaintiffs filed a motion for preliminary injunction. ECF No. 8. Under Local Rule 65.1(c), Defendants' response was due on August 26, 2022. Defendants have filed a motion for an 89-day extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion. ECF No. 9. Plaintiffs consent to a 30-day extension but ask that they also be given 30 days to reply. ECF No. 11. Due to the need to ensure that the record in this case is properly developed, it is hereby ORDERED that9 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Application for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' motion before or on November 23, 2022, and Plaintiffs shall file any reply before or on December 23, 2022. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be HELD IN ABEYANCE until a decision is issued on Plaintiffs' motion. It is FURTHER ORDERED that10 Defendants' Motion to Expedite Discovery is GRANTED. The Court finds that limited discovery at this stage is "reasonable[]" "in light of all of the surrounding circumstances." Guttenberg v. Emery , 26 F. Supp. 3d 88, 98 (D.D.C. 2014) (quotation marks omitted). Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' Interrogatories, filed at ECF No. 10-3, before or on September 21, 2022, subject to any particular objections Plaintiffs may raise. The parties shall inform the Court of any discovery disputes in accordance with the Local Rules prior to filing any discovery motions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9 7-2022 (lcrc3) |
||
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 08/24 2:29 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re10 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Rave, Helen) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 08/24 2:27 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Rave, Helen) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Tue 08/23 9:32 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re10 Motion to Expedite Discovery filed by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE.(Lyon, George) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order | ||
11 | 11
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Tue 08/23 9:10 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re9 Motion for Extension of Time to filed by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE.(Lyon, George) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Expedite
Tue 08/23 10:58 AM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery by ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Rave, Helen) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Interrogatories | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 08/23 10:55 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Application for Preliminary Injunction by ROBERT J. CONTEE, III, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Rave, Helen) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 19, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Fri 08/19 11:25 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE.(Lyon, George) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Hanson Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, Yzaguirre Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, Chaney Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, Klun Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order | ||
Monday, August 15, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/15 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mateya Beth Kelley on behalf of All Defendants (Kelley, Mateya) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/08 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Marie Rave on behalf of All Defendants (Rave, Helen) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/08 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Saindon on behalf of All Defendants (Saindon, Andrew) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to DC Government Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General
Mon 08/08 2:40 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT J. CONTEE, III served on 8/8/2022; DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA served on 8/8/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 8/8/2022. ( Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 8/29/2022.) (Lyon, George) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/08 3:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) |
||
Friday, August 05, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to DCAG,DCDFT, Mayor
Fri 08/05 9:45 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Errata
Wed 08/03 5:30 PM
ERRATA by NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON, ERIC KLUN, TYLER YZAGUIRRE re1 Complaint, filed by TYLER YZAGUIRRE, ERIC KLUN, NATHAN CHANEY, ANDREW HANSON. (Lyon, George) |
|
notice
Notice of QC- New Case
Wed 08/03 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to gll@bergstromattorneys.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) |
||
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/01 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT against ERIC KLUN, ANDREW HANSON, NATHAN CHANEY, TYLER YZAGUIRRE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9409010) filed by ERIC KLUN, ANDREW HANSON, NATHAN CHANEY, TYLER YZAGUIRRE.(Lyon, George) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bowser, | ||
Att: 3 Summons OAG, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Contee |