Oliver et al v. Motil
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10571
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10571
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Arthur I Harris |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01062 |
Nature of Suit | 41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e) |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Matthew M. Motil
7011 Chadbourne Drive
North Olmsted, OH 44070 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Toby Oliver
12371 Village Way
Fort Myers, FL 33912 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Hansen
12970 Simsbury Terrace
Fort Myers, FL 33913 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 02/02 1:33 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1062 Closed (mgaug) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
court
Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI
Tue 01/10 3:43 PM
Hearing Not Held NO RESPONSE; COMPLAINT DISMISSED 1/4/23-- (mg) |
||
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
BNC
Notice of Order to Dismiss Case
Sat 01/07 12:11 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/06/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismissing Case (PDF)
Wed 01/04 2:49 PM
Order Dismissing Case Signed on 1/4/2023 . (mgaug crt) |
|
Sunday, January 01, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (PDF)
Sun 01/01 7:46 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's First Discovery Requests Upon Each of Plaintiffs Oliver and Hansen Filed by Matthew M. Motil. (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI
Tue 12/20 2:51 PM
Hearing Not Held --MOOT-- (mg) |
||
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
BNC
Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF)
Sat 12/17 12:10 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Notice Date 12/16/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Set Hearing (PDF)
Wed 12/14 12:42 PM
Order to Set Hearing Signed on 12/13/2022 . Objections due by 1/3/2023. If an objection is filed the court will hold a hearing scheduled for 1/10/2023 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug crt) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Document
Wed 12/07 2:25 PM
Document Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiffs Danielle Hansen and Toby Oliver's Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §727 Filed by Danielle Hansen, Toby Oliver. (Duncan, Matthew aty) |
|
Sunday, November 20, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Hearing
Sun 11/20 6:39 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Matthew M. Motil . Hearing scheduled for 12/20/2022 at 10:00 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Sun 11/20 6:37 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Matthew M. Motil (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 09/13 5:33 PM
Hearing Held --COURT TO ISSUE SCHEDULING ORDER-- (mgaug) |
||
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Response
Tue 08/23 5:49 PM
Response to Complaint (Answer) Filed by Matthew M. Motil (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Issued
Thu 08/04 2:26 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Matthew M. Motil Answer due 9/6/2022. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/13/2022 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 08/04 1:30 PM
Receipt of Complaint ([LINK 22-01062 aih] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45346049. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/03 10:49 AM
Adversary case 22-01062 Complaint by Toby Oliver, Danielle Hansen against Matthew M. Motil. Fee Amount $350 Complaint of Creditors, Danielle Hansen and Toby Oliver to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 USC Section 727 Nature of Suit:41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)) (Duncan, Matthew aty) |