Aaron Kogan v. Hill Phoenix, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-05427 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV20514 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 30, 2023 12:54 AM PST |
Defendant
Dover Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hill Phoenix, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Cooler Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Barker Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Kogan
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 11/07/2022
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a joint status report on 2/3/2023 indicating that they have reached an agreement in principle to settle this case21 . The Court accordingly vacates the 2/10/2023 post-settlement status conference, and this action is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. For 30 days from the date of this order, the Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this order and to reopen the action nunc pro tunc on motion of any party. By operation of this order and without further court action, the dismissal in this case will convert to a dismissal with prejudice on the 31st day, absent a timely motion to vacate and reopen. See document for further details. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() STATUS REPORT (Joint) re Settlement filed by Defendant Hill Phoenix, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The parties conferred with the Court. The case did not settle. (hr) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() AMENDED ORDER RE TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE *Amended to reflect new call in numbers* by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, amending Order Re Telephonic Settlement Conference18 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER RE TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The Telephonic Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for January 19, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (klg) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) |
|
16 | 16
![]() PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) |
|
15 | 15
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 11/7/2022 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court vacates the mandatory scheduling conference set for 9/9/2022 and issues this case management order. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order based on an evaluation of the complexity of the case. Jury Trial set for 6/12/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 6/2/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 11/7/2022. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 1/6/2023. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 1/13/2023. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 1/13/2023. Settlement Conference Deadline 1/27/2023. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 2/10/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 2/3/2023. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 5/12/2023. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 5/19/2023. See document for further details. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant Hill Phoenix, Inc... (Murphy, Paul) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge R. Gary Klausner, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-05932 RGK(PDx) (rn) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 served on August 16, 2022.(Murphy, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 15, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on September 9, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by August 30, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) |
|
10 | 10
![]() CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Jury Demand5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Aaron Kogan.. (Yeager, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Hill Phoenix, Inc. and Dover Corporation Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-05932 (Murphy, Paul) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Hill Phoenix, Inc. and Dover Corporation Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc., (Murphy, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV20514 Receipt No: ACACDC-33748619 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Hill Phoenix, Inc. and Dover Corporation Hill Phoenix, Inc., Dover Corporation. (Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party Dover Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party Hill Phoenix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Murphy, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 08/04 1:56 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF Summons and Complaint against Defendants Does, Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc., National Cooler Corporation, The Barker Company. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Aaron Kogan.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 08/04 2:00 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aaron Kogan, upon Defendant Dover Corporation served on 7/5/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 07/05/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 08/04 2:02 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aaron Kogan, upon Defendant Hill Phoenix, Inc. served on 7/5/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT 07/15/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/04 2:05 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT 08/02/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh) |