California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:22-cv-05427
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2022
Terminated:Feb 06, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV20514
Last checked: Monday Jan 30, 2023 12:54 AM PST
Defendant
Dover Corporation
Represented By
Mario Horwitz
Murphy Rosen LLP
contact info
Paul D. Murphy
Murphy Rosen LLP
contact info
Paul D Murphy
Murphy Rosen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hill Phoenix, Inc.
Represented By
Mario Horwitz
Murphy Rosen LLP
contact info
Paul D. Murphy
Murphy Rosen LLP
contact info
Paul D Murphy
Murphy Rosen LLP
contact info
Defendant
National Cooler Corporation
Defendant
The Barker Company
Plaintiff
Aaron Kogan
Represented By
George E Akwo
Galaw Group
contact info
Kenneth C Yeager
Law Office Of Drociak And Yeager
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 11/07/2022


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 06, 2023
22 22 order Dismissing Case Tue 02/07 11:47 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a joint status report on 2/3/2023 indicating that they have reached an agreement in principle to settle this case21 . The Court accordingly vacates the 2/10/2023 post-settlement status conference, and this action is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. For 30 days from the date of this order, the Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this order and to reopen the action nunc pro tunc on motion of any party. By operation of this order and without further court action, the dismissal in this case will convert to a dismissal with prejudice on the 31st day, absent a timely motion to vacate and reopen. See document for further details. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
21 21 misc Status Report Fri 02/03 9:13 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) re Settlement filed by Defendant Hill Phoenix, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
20 20 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 01/20 3:11 PM
MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The parties conferred with the Court. The case did not settle. (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
19 19 5 pgs order Order Fri 01/13 4:23 PM
AMENDED ORDER RE TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE *Amended to reflect new call in numbers* by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, amending Order Re Telephonic Settlement Conference18 . (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
18 18 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/13 7:52 AM
ORDER RE TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The Telephonic Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for January 19, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (klg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
17 17 9 pgs order Order Wed 09/07 7:14 AM
ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 09/07 7:13 AM
PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/06 7:07 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 11/7/2022 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court vacates the mandatory scheduling conference set for 9/9/2022 and issues this case management order. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order based on an evaluation of the complexity of the case. Jury Trial set for 6/12/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 6/2/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 11/7/2022. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 1/6/2023. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 1/13/2023. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 1/13/2023. Settlement Conference Deadline 1/27/2023. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 2/10/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 2/3/2023. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 5/12/2023. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 5/19/2023. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 08/30 11:53 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant Hill Phoenix, Inc... (Murphy, Paul)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Transfer Pursuant to GO 21-01 DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34) Tue 08/30 10:12 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge R. Gary Klausner, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-05932 RGK(PDx) (rn)
Related: [-] lated Case
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
12 12 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 08/16 2:28 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 served on August 16, 2022.(Murphy, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, August 15, 2022
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 08/15 10:14 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on September 9, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by August 30, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 08/15 9:58 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
9 9 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 08/05 7:48 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Jury Demand5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 08/04 2:16 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 08/04 2:15 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 08/04 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 trial Jury Demand Thu 08/04 2:11 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Aaron Kogan.. (Yeager, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Wed 08/03 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Hill Phoenix, Inc. and Dover Corporation Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-05932 (Murphy, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 08/03 5:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Hill Phoenix, Inc. and Dover Corporation Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc., (Murphy, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 08/03 5:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/03 5:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV20514 Receipt No: ACACDC-33748619 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Hill Phoenix, Inc. and Dover Corporation Hill Phoenix, Inc., Dover Corporation. (Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party Dover Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party Hill Phoenix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Murphy, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 68 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Service Package,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proofs of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court Answer to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Plaintiff's 998 to Target
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 08/04 1:56 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF Summons and Complaint against Defendants Does, Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc., National Cooler Corporation, The Barker Company. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Aaron Kogan.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 08/04 2:00 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aaron Kogan, upon Defendant Dover Corporation served on 7/5/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 07/05/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 08/04 2:02 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aaron Kogan, upon Defendant Hill Phoenix, Inc. served on 7/5/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT 07/15/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/04 2:05 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Dover Corporation, Hill Phoenix, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT 08/02/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]