Lynch et al v. Motil
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10571
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10571
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Arthur I Harris |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01063 |
Nature of Suit | 65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Matthew M. Motil
7011 Chadbourne Drive
North Olmsted, OH 44070 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Lynch
2710 Orchard Knob Dr.
Atlanta, GA 30339 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IRA Services Trust Company
2710 Orchard Knob Dr
Atlanta, GA 30339 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
court
Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI
Tue 04/04 8:40 AM
Trial Not Held --CASE DISMISSED 1/4/23--(mg) |
||
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 02/02 1:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1063 Closed (mgaug) |
||
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
BNC
Notice of Order to Dismiss Case
Sat 01/07 12:11 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/06/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismissing Case (PDF)
Wed 01/04 2:49 PM
Order Dismissing Case Signed on 1/4/2023 . (mgaug crt) |
|
Sunday, January 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (PDF)
Sun 01/01 6:51 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's First Discovery Requests Upon Plaintiff Lynch Filed by Matthew M. Motil. (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
BNC
Notice of Order (PDF)
Thu 12/22 12:12 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/21/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI
Tue 12/20 2:52 PM
Hearing Not Held --MOOT-- (mg) |
||
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
BNC
Notice of Scheduling Order
Sat 12/17 12:10 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/16/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order (PDF)
Mon 12/19 1:06 PM
Order Signed on 12/14/2022 . (mgaug crt) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order (PDF)
Wed 12/14 7:14 AM
Pretrial Minutes and Scheduling Order Signed on 12/12/2022 . Discovery due by 1/31/2023. Trial date set for 4/4/2023 at 09:00 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug crt) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Mon 12/12 4:17 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding of Complaint of Plaintiffs Kenneth P. Lynch, Trustee and IRA Services Trust Company to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 USC Sec. 727 Filed by IRA Services Trust Company, Kenneth Lynch. (Kramer, Herbert aty) |
|
Sunday, November 20, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Sun 11/20 10:41 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Matthew M. Motil . Hearing scheduled for 12/20/2022 at 10:00 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Sun 11/20 10:40 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Matthew M. Motil (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2022 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 09/13 5:35 PM
Hearing Held --COURT TO ISSUE SCHEDULING ORDER-- (mgaug) |
||
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Response
Tue 08/23 6:13 PM
Response to Complaint (Answer) Filed by Matthew M. Motil (Coffey, Thomas aty) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 08/17 3:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Matthew M. Motil 8/9/2022 (Kramer, Herbert aty) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
court
Notice of Filing Deficiency
Fri 08/12 12:28 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency to Herbert Kramer: Incorrect ECF Event Code used, corrective action required. (mgaug) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/10 2:13 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by IRA Services Trust Company, Kenneth Lynch. (Kramer, Herbert aty) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Issued
Thu 08/04 2:29 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Matthew M. Motil Answer due 9/6/2022. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/13/2022 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (mgaug) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/03 1:50 PM
Adversary case 22-01063 Complaint by Kenneth Lynch, IRA Services Trust Company against Matthew M. Motil. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit:65 (Dischargeability (Other)) (Kramer, Herbert aty) |