WALKER v. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John M Younge |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03154 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 04, 2023 5:47 AM EST |
Defendant
SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ISAIAH WALKER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Mon 07/15 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA,USCA Case Number 24-2275 (bw) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
Notice of Cross Appeal (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 07/10 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by ISAIAH WALKER. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAEDC-17592230. Appeal Record due by 7/19/2024. (LACY, ANDREW) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Thu 06/20 2:07 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY THE DEFENDANT27 , AND ALL PAPERS FILED IN SUPPORT THEREOF AND IN OPPOSITION THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION SHALL BE GRANTED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM FILED BY THE COURT ALONG WITH THIS ORDER. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 6/20/24. 6/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
35 | 35
21
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Thu 06/20 2:04 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 6/20/24. 6/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/16 11:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/1/2024. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 8/5/2024 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 15B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/16/24. 4/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
33 | 33
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 04/16 11:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE Pretrial Conference held on 4/16/24 (bw) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Wed 04/17 12:58 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: JURY SELECTION SET FOR 8/5/2024 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 15B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE. (bw) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Pretrial Memorandum
Tue 04/09 8:35 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by ISAIAH WALKER. (SKELTON, AUSTIN) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Pretrial Memorandum
Tue 04/09 7:17 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY Certificate of Service. (KENNEDY, WILLIAM) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 01/25 12:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Sur-Reply filed by ISAIAH WALKER. (LACY, ANDREW) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 01/18 6:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.(KENNEDY, WILLIAM) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement SEPTA's Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts | ||
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 01/11 9:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ISAIAH WALKER.(LACY, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 12/07 4:07 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.Motion for Summary Judgment.(CATALANO, ELIZABETH) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A - SEPTA Equal Employment Opportunity & Affirmative Action Policy, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B - SEPTA Harassment Prevention & Retaliation Policy, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C - Walker Hiring Materials, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D - SEPTA ADA Reasonable Accommodation Policy, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit E - SEPTA ADA Reasonable Accommodation Procedure Manual, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit F - Collective Bargaining Agreement between SEPTA and TWU Local 234, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit G - 30(b)(6) Deposition of J. Bankston, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit H - SEPTA-Walker Health Records, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit I - Deposition of Plaintiff Isaiah Walker, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit J - STOP-BANG Questionnaire, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit K - Walker Formal Hearing, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit L - Walker Points History Report, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit M - Walker Work Resumption Agreement, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit N - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit O - Walker FMLA Records, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit P - Walker Charge of Discrimination, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Q - Walker Right to Sue Notice | ||
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 10/06 3:40 PM
ANSWER to25 Amended Complaint by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.(KENNEDY, WILLIAM) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 09/22 2:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, filed by ISAIAH WALKER.(SKELTON, AUSTIN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/31 9:51 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (ECF NO.23 ) IS DENIED; THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO FORWARD A LETTER TO CHAMBERS OR FILE A MOTION TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 08/30/2023. 08/31/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/29 3:14 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by ISAIAH WALKER. (LACY, ANDREW) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 08/18 9:57 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 4/16/24 AT 11:00 AM IN (VIA VIDEO) BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 9/21/23. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 12/7/23. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 8/17/23. 8/18/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/17 2:43 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by ISAIAH WALKER. (LACY, ANDREW) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/08 2:46 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES: A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/12/2024 02:00 PM via Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/21/2023. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 11/7/2023; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 6/8/23. 6/8/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Tue 06/06 3:25 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by ISAIAH WALKER. (LACY, ANDREW) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Thu 04/27 10:46 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE17 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/27/23.4/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Thu 04/27 8:45 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16653616.) filed by ISAIAH WALKER.Affidavit.(LACY, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/11 1:16 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 6/21/2023, A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/9/2024 02:00 PM via Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/2/2023. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 9/7/2023; AS IT IS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/11/23. 4/11/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
Att: 1 LETTER TO CHAMBERS | ||
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Wed 04/12 3:04 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTIONS DUE BY 9/7/2023. (bw) |
||
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/20 10:56 AM
ORDER THAT THE ARBITRATION HEARING IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER, SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 22, 2023 AT 9:30 A.M. IS CANCELED AND THIS MATTER SHALL BE REMOVED FROM THE COURTS ARBITRATION PROGRAM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/20/23. 1/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, E-MAILED TO ARB.(bw) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing
Fri 01/20 10:04 AM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Arbitration, scheduled for 3/22/2023(sah) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 01/19 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 3/22/2023 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 5C.(sah) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Scheduling Order
Wed 12/21 2:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/7/2023 03:00 PM IN Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE., ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/21/2023., ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 7/7/2023; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/21/22. 12/21/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
11 | 11
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 12/21 2:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE Rule 16 Conference held on 12/21/22 (bw) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/16 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH M. CATALANO on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with Certificate of Service(CATALANO, ELIZABETH) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
adr
Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference
Thu 12/15 4:09 PM
Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference(sah) |
|
Att: 1 Consent | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/15 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nisha Krishnan on behalf of ISAIAH WALKER with Certificate of Service(Krishnan, Nisha) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report Of
Wed 12/14 3:04 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (KENNEDY, WILLIAM) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 11/22 11:05 AM
ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/21/2022 02:00 via video conference PM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE; AS OUTLINE HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/22/22. 11/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/21 4:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.(KENNEDY, WILLIAM) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 09/22 12:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ISAIAH WALKER. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY waiver sent on 9/22/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (LACY, ANDREW) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
trial
Exhibit
Tue 08/09 10:22 AM
EXHIBIT DESIGNATION FORM - NO RELATED CASE by ISAIAH WALKER.. (LACY, ANDREW) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/09 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 8/9/22 (bw) |
|
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Tue 08/09 9:35 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event; the Related Case section of the form was not filled out. (sbt) |
||
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 08/08 7:03 PM
COMPLAINT against SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16096420.), filed by ISAIAH WALKER.(LACY, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |