Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Giri et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03091 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2023 7:58 AM EST |
Defendant
Rathnakishore Giri
6481 Summers Nook Dr.
New Albany, OH 43054 |
|
Defendant
Loka Pavani Giri
684` Summers Nook Dr.
New Albany, OH 43054 |
|
Defendant
NBD Eidetic Capital LLC
|
|
Defendant
SR Private Equity LLC
|
|
Defendant
Giri Subramani
6841 Summers Nook Dr.
New Albany, OH 43054 |
|
Intervenor
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Fraud Section, Criminal Division 1400 New York Avenue NW Third Floor
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
1155 21st St. NW
Washington, DC 20581 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER granting16 Motion to Intervene and Stay Proceedings. Accordingly, this matter will be stayed pending resolution of the parallel criminal proceeding in United States v. Rathnakishore Giri, 2:22-cr-223. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/3/2023. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Intervene and Stay Proceedings by Intervenor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jennings, Lucy) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 11/29 10:36 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Rathnakishore Giri answer due 12/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/29/22. (jr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to13 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendant Rathnakishore Giri. New date requested 12/23/2022. (er) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rathnakishore Giri; SR Private Equity, LLC; NBD Eidetic Capital, LLC; Giri Subramani; and Loka Pavani Giri. (jlk) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() First Application to Clerk for entry of default against Rathnakishore Giri, NBD Eidetic LLC, SR Private Equity LLC and Relief Defendants Giri Subramani and Loka Pavani Giri . (Kenmotsu, Karen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 07, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to SR Private Equity LLC on 8/23/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Kenmotsu, Karen) |
|
10 | 10
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to NBD Eidetic Capital LLC on 8/23/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Kenmotsu, Karen) |
|
9 | 9
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Rathnakishore Giri on 8/23/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Kenmotsu, Karen) |
|
8 | 8
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons to Loka Pavani Giri served on Loka Pavani Giri on 8/23/22, filed by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Kenmotsu, Karen) |
|
7 | 7
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons to Giri Subramani served on Giri Subramani on 8/23/22, filed by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Kenmotsu, Karen) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Kenmotsu for Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Kenmotsu, Karen) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to Loka Pavani Giri, Rathnakishore Giri, NBD Eidetic Capital LLC, SR Private Equity LLC, Giri Subramani. (vb) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Marsh for Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Marsh, Luke) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Kenmotsu, Karen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission re1 Complaint (Kenmotsu, Karen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Kenmotsu, Karen) |