Maryland District Court
Judge:Brendan Abell Hurson
Case #: 1:22-cv-02027
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2022
Case in other court:California Northern, 4:21-cv-05074
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2023 10:17 AM EST
Defendant
George Divel III
Represented By
Timothy Joseph Mummert
Mummert Law Firm
contact info
Nicolas Vaca
Horst Legal Counsel, PC
contact info
Jason Horst
Horst Legal Counsel, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Berkowitz
Plaintiff
Benjamin Dodge
Represented By
Malcolm Leader-Picone
Leader-Picone & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Lasseter
Represented By
Malcolm Leader-Picone
Leader-Picone & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
One Triple Two, LLC
Represented By
Malcolm Leader-Picone
Leader-Picone & Young, LLP
contact info
Justin Michael Hollimon
contact info

GPO May 13 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 5/13/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 13, 2024
74 74 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/13 9:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re73 MOTION to Amend/Correct 72 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Complaint filed by George Divel III.(Horst, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit