Brown v. Chelsea 7 Corporation et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eric R Komitee |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-04776 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 11, 2023 11:20 AM EST |
Defendant
Chelsea 7 Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dumesh Kankanamalage
|
|
Defendant
Rainbow Station 7 Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indika Subeappa Kankanamalage
|
|
Plaintiff
Jamal Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT, that Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs Jamal Brownand Prabath Kariyapperuma and against defendants Chelsea 7 Corporation, Rainbow Station 7 Inc., and Indika Subeappa Kankanamalage, in this action in the total sum of Twenty-Eight Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents ($28,000.00) (the "Judgment Amount"), payable as as described herein. (Must see Judgment for further details) Signed by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 6/12/2023. (SG) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jamal Brown, Prabath Kariyapperuma (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Wed 06/07 11:47 AM
ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' status report22 , Plaintiffs shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal as to Defendant Dumesh Kankanamalage by 6/14/2023 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/7/2023. (IS) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() STATUS REPORT by Jamal Brown, Prabath Kariyapperuma (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 06/02 3:09 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs filed a notice of acceptance21 of Defendants' Rule 68 offer of judgment on June 1, 2023. The offer of judgment appears to resolve Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Chelsea 7 Corporation, Rainbow Station 7 Inc., and Indika Subeappa Kankanamalage, but exclude the claims against Defendant Dumesh Kankanamalage. Plaintiffs should inform the Court by 6/9/2023 whether the accepted offer of judgment also resolves all claims against Dumesh Kankanamalage and, if not, whether Plaintiffs intend to continue litigating the claims against him or will dismiss the claims against him. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/2/2023. (IS) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Jamal Brown, Prabath Kariyapperuma (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Prabath Kariyapperuma (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Mizrahi on behalf of Jamal Brown (notification declined or already on case) (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Chelsea 7 Corporation, Dumesh Kankanamalage, Rainbow Station 7 Inc., Indika Subeappa Kankanamalage has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Chelsea 7 Corporation, Dumesh Kankanamalage, Rainbow Station 7 Inc., Indika Subeappa Kankanamalage is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Request for Certificate of Default by Jamal Brown (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Fri 03/24 3:07 PM
NOTICE re16 Request for Certificate of Default--Brenna B. Mahoney is the Clerk of Court for the Eastern District of New York as of February 1, 2022. Please correct the proposed certificate of default and refile. (JP) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 03/23 6:38 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment by no later than 60 days following an entry of default by the Clerk of Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/23/2023. (IS) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Request for Certificate of Default by Jamal Brown (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Status Report Order
Fri 03/17 9:53 AM
ORDER: The telephonic-initial conference scheduled for 3/17/2023 at 2:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara is hereby adjourned sine die. Plaintiff shall file a request for certificate of default on or before 4/17/2023 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/17/2023. (EM) |
||
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamal Brown. Indika Subeappa Kankanamalage served on 1/6/2023, answer due 1/27/2023. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
14 | 14
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamal Brown. Chelsea 7 Corporation served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 01/20 6:12 PM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file13 is granted. The deadline to file proof of service of the summons and Complaint on Defendants Chelsea 7 Corporation and Indika Subeappa Kankanamalage is extended to 2/17/2023 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/20/2023. (IS) |
||
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summons Returned Executed by Jamal Brown. (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 2:00 P.M. on 03/17/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274; access code is 6534420 . Plaintiff is directed to notify defendant of this scheduling order at the time defendant makes an appearance with in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than 03/15/2023 . Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/18/2023. (EM) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamal Brown. Rainbow Station 7 Inc. served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
10 | 10
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamal Brown. Dumesh Kankanamalage served on 1/6/2023, answer due 1/27/2023. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/09 11:44 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (EF) |
||
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit of Service by Jamal Brown. (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 01/05 7:37 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff must file affidavits of service by 1/19/23. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/5/2023. (JP) |
||
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 01/04 10:05 AM
ORDER re8 Letter filed by Jamal Brown. Having failed to timely serve defendants, plaintiff may not "proceed with the action" (DE #8) without seeking and securing a nunc pro tunc extension of the 90-day period of time for service of process pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/4/2023. (JP) |
||
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Letter to Chambers by Jamal Brown (Mizrahi, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 12/27 10:52 AM
ORDER -- A review of the docket in this case indicates that Plaintiff has not filed proof of timely service of the Summons and Complaint as required on any defendant. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 ( l ), (m). No later than January 5, 2023, Plaintiff must either file proof of timely service on the docket or file a motion requesting an extension of time to effect service for good cause. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Failure to comply may result in a dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 12/27/2022. (AG) |
||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 12/27 12:30 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER According to the docket sheet, plaintiff has neither served any of the defendants nor taken any other steps to pursue his claims since the action was commenced on August 15, 2022. Plaintiff is directed, on pain of sanctions, to file a status report by January 3, 2023 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/27/2022. (LK) |
||
Monday, August 15, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to Chelsea 7 Corporation, Dumesh Kankanamalage, Rainbow Station 7 Inc., Indika Subeappa Kankanamalage. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
6 | 6
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
5 | 5
![]() In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Proposed Summons. by Jamal Brown (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jamal Brown (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Jamal Brown (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Chelsea 7 Corporation, Dumesh Kankanamalage, Rainbow Station 7 Inc., Indika Subeappa Kankanamalage filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15842867, filed by Jamal Brown. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/15 11:20 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |